Hernandez v. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01343 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2017 4:09 AM CST |
Defendant
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Magdalena Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Tue 12/05 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's Order of November 29, 2017, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the above-styled and -numbered cause is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/5/2017) (ndt) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 11/29 12:16 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated herein, as well as the reasons argued by Defendant, the Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss should be GRANTED and the above-styled and -numbered cause should be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/29/2017) (ndt) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Mon 12/04 9:42 AM
Civil Case Terminated per10 Order. (axm) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply
Tue 06/20 4:35 PM
REPLY filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA re:5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Original Petition and Brief in Support (Nunnallee, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 06/14 12:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by Magdalena Hernandez re:5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Original Petition and Brief in Support (Vilt, Robert) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/01 8:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Magdalena Hernandez. (Vilt, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 05/25 2:51 PM
Appendix in Support filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA re5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Original Petition and Brief in Support (Nunnallee, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/25 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Original Petition and Brief in Support filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Nunnallee, Adam) |
|
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/25 10:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2017. Discovery due by 10/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2018. The above case is set for trial at 11/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/25/2017) (twd) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Cummings (Dallas)
Fri 05/19 4:52 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/19 4:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company NA for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company. (Nunnallee, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 05/19 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 17-04954 filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8420089) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Nunnallee, Adam) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/19/2017 to flatten pdf) (axm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement |