Original Case: 8:16-cv-04003

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv.pr-01640
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Case Filed:May 19, 2017
Terminated:Apr 12, 2018
Last checked: Friday Apr 13, 2018 4:33 AM EDT
Amicus Supporting Appellant
ANDERSON COUNTY, SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By
Leon Carroll Harmon
10TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT SOLICITOR'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
PIPELINE SAFETY TRUST
Represented By
Catherine H. McElveen
LEWIS BABCOCK, LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Represented By
Cynthia L. Taub
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
David H. Coburn
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF OIL PIPE LINES
Represented By
Cynthia L. Taub
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
David H. Coburn
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
GPA MIDSTREAM ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Cynthia L. Taub
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
David H. Coburn
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
TEXAS PIPELINE ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Cynthia L. Taub
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
David H. Coburn
STEPTOE & JOHNSON PLLC
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNTIES
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL LEAGUE OF CITIES
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CLEAN WATER AGENCIES
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
AMERICAN FOREST AND PAPER ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
AMERICAN IRON AND STEEL INSTITUTE
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
EDISON ELECTRIC INSTITUTE
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL MINING ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
UTILITY WATER ACT GROUP
Represented By
Brent Alan Rosser
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Samuel L. Brown
HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP
contact info
Nash E. Long III
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By
Patrick Morrisey
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF WEST VIRGINIA
contact info
Zachary Aaron Viglianco
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
John S. Gray
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF WEST VIRGINIA
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Alan Wilson
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By
Steven T. Marshall
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF ALABAMA
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By
Leslie Rutledge
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By
Curtis T. Hill Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF INDIANA
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By
Derek Schmidt
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By
Jeff Landry
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF LOUSIANA
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By
Joshua D. Hawley
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MISSOURI
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By
Mike Hunter
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF OKLAHOMA
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF UTAH
Represented By
Sean Reyes
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF UTAH
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By
Brad D. Schimel
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
PHIL BRYANT
Defendant - Appellee
KINDER MORGAN ENERGY PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By
Todd Winfield Billmire
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Clayton Monroe Custer
WOMBLE CARLYLE SANDRIDGE & RICE, PLLC
contact info
Richard Edwin Morton
WOMBLE CARLYLE SANDRIDGE & RICE, PLLC
contact info
James P. Cooney III
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Jackson Rehm Price
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PLANTATION PIPE LINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
Todd Winfield Billmire
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Clayton Monroe Custer
WOMBLE CARLYLE SANDRIDGE & RICE, PLLC
contact info
Richard Edwin Morton
WOMBLE CARLYLE SANDRIDGE & RICE, PLLC
contact info
James P. Cooney III
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Jackson Rehm Price
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
UPSTATE FOREVER
Represented By
Frank S. Holleman III
SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Christopher Kaltman DeScherer
SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Nicholas Steele Torrey
SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SAVANNAH RIVERKEEPER
Represented By
Frank S. Holleman III
SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Christopher Kaltman DeScherer
SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info
Nicholas Steele Torrey
SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
contact info

GPO Apr 12 2018
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-04003-HMH. [1000274928]. [17-1640]
GPO Apr 12 2018
OPINION ATTACHMENT. [17-1640]
Docket last updated: 04/13/2018 4:26 AM EDT
Friday, May 19, 2017
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-04003-HMH. Case manager: CPoulsen. 17-1640 CP [Entered: 05/19/2017 09:46 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-04003-HMH. Mailed to: Richard Edwin Morton. 17-1640 CP [Entered: 05/19/2017 09:57 AM]
Related: [-]