Oakridge Holdings, Inc.
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kathleen H Sanberg |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-31669 |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Oakridge Holdings, Inc.
3255 Sibley Memorial Hwy
St Paul, MN 55121 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
court
MNB Close bankruptcy case
Wed 09/19 11:11 AM
IT IS ORDERED: The case is closed and the trustee (if a trustee has been appointed) is discharged. (Chris MNBM) |
||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Wed 07/18 5:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/18/2018 2:30:00 PM ]. File Size [ 7027 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:38 ]. (admin) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Wed 06/06 11:01 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2018 10:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 2958 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:10 ]. (admin) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Thu 03/01 11:01 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/28/2018 1:30:00 PM ]. File Size [ 3602 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:30 ]. (admin) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
MNB Chapter 11 monthly operating report FRBP 2015
Tue 12/19 1:22 PM
Operating report of debtor in possession filed by Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
trustee
MNB U. S. Trustee recommendation in favor of employment
Tue 06/27 3:21 PM
Notice of U. S. Trustee recommendation in favor of9 Application to employ professional. (Wencil, Sarah) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
MNB Affidavit (Individual, not service)
Mon 06/26 12:28 PM
Affidavit filed by Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
trustee
MNB Report of US Trustee of inability to appoint a creditors' committee
Mon 06/26 3:08 PM
Report of US Trustee of inability to appoint a creditors' committee. (Wencil, Sarah) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
MNB Add creditor to matrix
Tue 06/06 1:52 PM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: Securities & Exchange Commission. (Debbie MNBS) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
trustee
MNB U. S. Trustee recommendation opposing employment
Wed 05/31 3:13 PM
U. S. Trustee Report and recommendation opposing9 Application to employ professional. Proof of service. (Wencil, Sarah) |
|
Sunday, May 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 05/28 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/28/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Fri 05/26 6:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/26/2017 9:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 11817 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:24:37 ]. (admin) |
|
13 | 13
order
MNB Joint administration - motion
Fri 05/26 2:25 PM
Order Granting Motion for joint administration of lead case 3:17-bk-31670 with member case 3:17-bk-31669. An Order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Oakridge Holdings, Inc. and Stinar HG, Inc. d/b/a Stinar Corporation. The docket in BKY 17-31670 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case, and all further filings should be made only in that case. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM) |
|
12 | 12
misc
MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice
Fri 05/26 10:30 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Kruckeberg Industries, LLC and Abigail M McGibbon. (McGibbon, Abigail) |
|
court
MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order
Fri 05/26 11:03 AM
Minutes re:5 expedited motion for joint administration. Kenneth Edstrom appeared on behalf of debtor; Phillip Bohl appeared on behalf of Kruckeberg Industries, LLC; Sarah Wencil appeared on behalf of the United States Trustee; and Roylene Champeaux appeared on behalf of the United States Small Business Administration. Order to be entered. (Lynn MNBM) Modified on 5/26/2017 to add "Small Business Administration." (Lynn MNBM) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors
Fri 05/26 12:00 AM
BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors. Notice Date 05/25/2017. (Admin.) |
|
court
MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order
Fri 05/26 10:08 AM
Minutes re: Motion for joint administration. No appearances. Continued to May 26, 2017 at 9:30 a.m . (Carrie MNBM) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice
Wed 05/24 11:33 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Signature Bank and Karl J. Johnson. (Johnson, Karl) |
|
9 | 9
aplcn
MNB Application to employ professional
Wed 05/24 9:16 AM
Application to employ Bradley Hennen as Special Counsel filed by Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proof of service, Proposed order. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Tue 05/23 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/28/2017 at 1:30 PM at Mtg Minneapolis, US Courthouse, 300 S 4th St, Rm 1017 (10th Floor). Proofs of Claims due by 9/26/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/26/2017. (Debbie MNBS) |
|
7 | 7
notice
MNB Notice of continued hearing
Tue 05/23 3:45 PM
Expedited Notice of continued hearing filed by Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. Proof of service. Hearing to be held on 5/26/2017 at 09:30 AM Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
6 | 6
misc
MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice
Tue 05/23 2:48 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by United States Small Business Administration and Roylene A. Champeaux. Proof of service. (Champeaux, Roylene) |
|
5 | 5
21
pgs
motion
MNB Motion for joint administration
Tue 05/23 2:19 PM
Expedited (first day) Motion for joint administration of cases 3:17-bk-31669, 17-31670 filed by Debtor 1 Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 5/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
4 | 4
misc
MNB Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only)
Tue 05/23 1:42 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by Oakridge Holdings, Inc. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
misc
MNB Add creditor to matrix
Tue 05/23 11:45 AM
List of Creditors load 13 creditors added (ADIclerk) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
aplcn
MNB Application to employ professional
Mon 05/22 5:30 PM
Application to employ Kenneth Edstrom as Debtor's Counsel filed by Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proof of service. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice
Mon 05/22 2:23 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Kruckeberg Industries, LLC and Phillip Bohl. (Bohl, Phillip) |
|
1 | 1
35
pgs
misc
MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee)
Mon 05/22 1:48 PM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: Oakridge Holdings, Inc.. Attachment to voluntary petition for non-individuals filing for bankruptcy under chapter 11 (Form 201A) (for debtors required to file periodic reports with the SEC), List of creditors who have the 20 largest unsecured claims (Form 204), Summary of assets and liabilities for non-individuals (Form 206 - Summary), Schedules A/B, D-H (Form 206A/B, 206D - 206H), Declaration under penalty of perjury for non-individual debtors (Form 202), Statement of financial affairs for non-individuals filing for bankruptcy (Form 207), Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor (Local Form 1007-1), Proof of authority to sign and file petition (Local Form 1008-1), List of equity security holders (if less than 101 holders). Fee Amount $1717.00. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 09/19/2017. (Edstrom, Kenneth) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/22 1:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-31669 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10007809. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
trustee
MNB Add attorney for US Trustee
Mon 05/22 2:38 PM
Attorney for US Trustee added to case. (Wencil, Sarah) |