Workman et al v. City of Cleveland et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James S Gwin |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01074 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 18, 2017 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
City of Cleveland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chief of Police Cleveland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mayor of Cleveland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Bruce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dominique Knox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Maxwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommie Pratt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tanis Quach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Workman
|
Represented By
|
1. | Several men and women arrested during Michael Brelo Acquittal Protest file lawsuit (clevescene.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/24/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Attorney Substitution
Tue 10/03 4:39 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Annette Butler and adding attorney Janeane R. Cappara filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Cappara, Janeane) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
~Util - Terminate Referral Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/08 2:43 PM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/8/17. Upon the parties' representation that all issues have been resolved, the docket as marked as settled and dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction as set forth in this entry. (D,MA) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 08/08 1:44 PM
Stipulated Dismissal Entry On July 20, 2017, Judge Gwin referred this case to Judge Polster for a mediation. The Court held a Settlement Conference August 1, 2017, at which time the Court mediated a settlement. Accordingly, the attorneys for the respective parties, do hereby stipulate that the claims of Plaintiff Tommie Pratt are dismissed with prejudice and that the claims of the other six Plaintiffs are settled and dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to ensure that the settlement agreement is executed. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/8/2017. (K,K) |
|
minutes
Mediation Conference
Tue 08/08 1:36 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster.Mediation Conference held on 8/8/2017. Case settled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 1 hour 30 minutes. (K,K) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 08/07 9:41 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] Mediation Conference reset for 8/8/2017 at 10:15 AM* in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (*Please note change in TIME only.) (K,K) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
minutes
Mediation Conference
Tue 08/01 1:21 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster.Mediation Conference held on 8/1/2017 with Plaintiffs Jordan Workman, Jessica Barnes, and Eric Maxwell; Plaintiffs' counsel James Hardiman, John Hildebrand, Sarah Gelsomino, Terry Gilbert, and Jacqueline C. Greene; Defendant's counsel Annette Butler and Janeane Capparas. Mediation will reconvene on 8/8/2017 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. The parties will continue working towards settlement and email the Court a status report no later than 3:00 p.m. on Monday, 8/7/2017 . (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 3 hours. (K,K) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 07/24 4:25 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2017 with counsel. Participating were Plaintiffs' counsel James Hardiman, John Hildebrand, Sarah Gelsomino, and Terry Gilbert and Defendants' counsel Annette Butler and Janeane Cappara. (Defendants). Plaintiffs are to submit position papers, with a copy to Court, no later than 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, July 25, 2017 . Defendants are to submit a response, with a copy to the Court, no later than 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, July 27, 2017 . Counsel shall submit the the Court a joint status update, to include the latest demand and offer, no later than 12:00 p.m. on Monday, July 31, 2017 . Mediation conference to be held on 8/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Counsel and plaintiffs are to appear in person. Plaintiffs who are unable to appear in person are to be available by phone. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 20 minutes. (K,K) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Fri 07/21 12:47 PM
Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 7/24/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement
Thu 07/20 4:35 PM
Order referring case to Judge Dan Aaron Polster for mediation on 8/1/17 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18B. (D,MA) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 07/20 4:10 PM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/20/17 that plaintiffs shall identify experts by 8/21/17 and defendants shall identify experts by 9/11/17. (D,MA) |
|
9 | 9
order
Case Management Conference Plan/Order
Thu 07/20 4:06 PM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/20/17. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be joined and pleadings amended by 7/20/17. Dispositive motions to be filed by 11/13/17 with responses due 11/27/17 and replies due 12/4/17. All discovery to be completed by 3/19/18. Status conference set for 12/15/17 at 12:00 p.m., and final pretrial conference set for 4/17/18 at 12:00 p.m., both in Chambers 18A. Jury trial is assigned on a two-week standby basis beginning 4/23/18 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA) |
|
8 | 8
minutes
Case Management Conference
Thu 07/20 3:51 PM
Minutes of case management conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 7/20/17. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 34 min.) (D,MA) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Mon 07/17 11:38 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Jacqueline) |
|
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 07/17 8:32 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that the case management conference set for 7/20/17 is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY and will be held at 2:00 p.m., Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. (D,MA) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Wed 06/14 9:03 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/14/17 setting a conference for 7/20/17 at 1:00 p.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Wed 06/14 9:00 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 6/14/17. (D,MA) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 8:29 AM
Answer to First Amended Complaint2 with Jury Demand filed by Chief of Police Cleveland, City of Cleveland, Mayor of Cleveland. (Butler, Annette) Modified text on 6/12/2017 (G,TH) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Tue 05/23 8:19 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/23 3:58 AM
First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Tommie Pratt, Jasmine Bruce, Tanis Quach, Jessica Barnes, Dominique Knox, Jordan Workman, Eric Maxwell. (Greene, Jacqueline) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 05/23 8:18 AM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (S,SR) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/23 8:19 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/22 11:53 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Defendants City of Cleveland, Frank Jackson, and Calvin Williams, filed by against All Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8167876. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 15-cv-01386 . Filed by Tommie Pratt, Jasmine Bruce, Tanis Quach, Jessica Barnes, Dominique Knox, Jordan Workman, Eric Maxwell. (Greene, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |