Guardian Benefits, LLC v. America Solutions et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alison J Nathan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03904 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2017 4:41 AM EST |
Defendant
America Solutions
200 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281 |
|
Defendant
Global Traders Insurance Services
875 Mamaroneck Ave
Mamaroneck, NY 10543 |
|
Defendant
Loyalty Insurance Group
777 6th Street, NW Suite 520
Washington, DC 20001 |
|
Defendant
John Doe Companies 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Caldwell
1910 Feddisburg Road
Alpine, AL 35014 |
|
Defendant
Marc Cooper
|
|
Defendant
Covert Duty
|
|
Plaintiff
Guardian Benefits, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Thu 09/28 9:00 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/27/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/27 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) America Solutions, Beverly Caldwell, Marc Cooper, Covert Duty, Global Traders Insurance Services, John Doe Companies 1-10, Loyalty Insurance Group. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/18 3:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Covert Duty. (pc) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/18 3:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beverly Caldwell. (pc) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/18 3:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marc Cooper. (pc) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/18 12:59 PM
ORDER: granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs request for 90 additional days to serve all defendants. The Court hereby adjourns the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for August 23, 2017 to November 17, 2017 at 2:00 P.M. If Plaintiff remains unable to serve all defendants pursuant to traditional means of service, Plaintiff can show cause why this Court should permit service by electronic mail by September 15, 2017. Initial conference set for 11/17/2017, at 2:00 P.M. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/18/2017) (ap) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 08/18 1:00 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 2:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (ap) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 08/18 3:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Israel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Beverly Caldwell, Marc Cooper, Covert Duty. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pc) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/17 3:55 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (Wealth Recoverys request that the Court (1) grant Wealth Recovery an additional period of ninety (90) days to serve all defendants in this action; (2) adjourn the August 23, 2017 initial pretrial conference until such time that defendants have been served; and (3) permit service by an alternate means, such as via electronic mail) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Ronald L. Israel, Esq. dated August 17, 2017. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC.(Israel, Ronald) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/17 3:06 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (Wealth Recoverys request that the Court (1) grant Wealth Recovery an additional period of ninety (90) days to serve all defendants in this action; (2) adjourn the August 23, 2017 initial pretrial conference until such time that defendants have been served; and (3) permit service by an alternate means, such as via electronic mail) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Ronald L. Israel, Esq. dated August 17, 2017. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC.(Pearlson, Alan) |
|
16 | 16
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 08/17 2:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Covert Duty, re:13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
15 | 15
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 08/17 2:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marc Cooper, re:13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
14 | 14
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 08/17 2:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beverly Caldwell, re:13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/17 2:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against America Solutions, Global Traders Insurance Services, John Doe Companies 1-10, Loyalty Insurance Group, Beverly Caldwell, Marc Cooper, Covert Duty with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,.(Israel, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 05/30 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/23/2017 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan, and as further set forth in this Order. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/25/2017) (rjm) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form
Tue 05/30 4:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Ronald Lawrence Israel to RE-FILE Document No. 10 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct. Re-file the OFFICIAL document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct OFFICIAL AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (kl) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 05/25 4:29 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Israel, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/24 11:58 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Loyalty Insurance Group. (kl) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/24 11:57 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Global Traders Insurance Services. (kl) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/24 11:55 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to America Solutions. (kl) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 05/24 11:36 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ronald Lawrence Israel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (kl) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 05/24 11:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Lawrence Israel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Guardian Benefits, LLC d/b/a Wealth Recovery International, John Does 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted. (kl) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 05/24 11:52 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 05/24 11:53 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 05/24 11:53 AM
Case Designated ECF. (kl) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Wed 05/24 11:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Ronald Lawrence Israel to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (kl) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 05/23 5:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Loyalty Insurance, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC d/b/a Wealth Recovery International. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 05/23 5:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Global Traders, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC d/b/a Wealth Recovery International. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 05/23 5:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to America Solutions, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC d/b/a Wealth Recovery International. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/23 5:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC d/b/a Wealth Recovery International.(Israel, Ronald) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 05/23 5:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Israel, Ronald) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/23 5:51 PM
COMPLAINT against America Solutions, Global Traders Insurance Services, John Does 1-10, Loyalty Insurance Group. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13700328)Document filed by Guardian Benefits, LLC d/b/a Wealth Recovery International.(Israel, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H |