Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Gary Feinerman
Case #: 1:17-cv-03862
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:May 23, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2017 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
YuppTV USA, Inc.
Represented By
John Huh
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Pamela Begaj
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Brian Joseph Boyle
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Plaintiff
Chandan Unchageri
Represented By
Craig Rein Frisch
Consumer Advocacy Center
contact info
Lance A. Raphael
Theconsumer Advocacy Center, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
YuppTV, Inc.
Terminated: 11/06/2017
Represented By
John Huh
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Pamela Begaj
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Brian Joseph Boyle
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2018
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/7/2018.Mailed notice.(jlj, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.