Jacqueline v. UBER Technologies inc et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03139 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
Travis Kalanick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raiser, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Uber USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Gayed
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit claims passengers incur hidden charges with Uber's "upfront" pricing model (nypost.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/03 9:49 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry22 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/3/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/02 5:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Travis Kalanick, Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA LLC (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Thu 10/19 5:27 PM
Letter re Agreed Upon Briefing Schedule by Jacqueline Gayed (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 10/13 11:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Catherine Anderson, Esq. for the plaintiff and Kenneth Schacter, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Pre-motion conference held on 10/13/2017. Defendants anticipated motion to compel arbitration was discussed. The motion to compel arbitration is deemed made. Counsel shall submit letter briefs and by October 20, 2017 counsel shall file a letter with their agreed upon briefing schedule. (Court Reporter: Not Reported.) (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 08/29 9:53 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application17 dated 7/14/17 is GRANTED. A pre motion conference is schedule for October 13, 2017 @ 11AM. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference and then file a letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/29/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 08/18 12:51 PM
Letter dated August 18, 2017 from Kenneth I. Schacter to the Honorable Frederic Block supplementing defendants' request for a pre-motion conference by Travis Kalanick, Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA LLC (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Second Circuit Decision in Meyer v. Uber Tech., Inc. | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/21 1:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Defendants' anticipated motion to compel arbitration filed by Jacqueline Gayed. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 07/14 5:14 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Defendants' anticipated motion to compel arbitration by Travis Kalanick, Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/13 2:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Travis Kalanick, Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/13 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Anne Silane on behalf of Travis Kalanick, Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA LLC (aty to be noticed) (Silane, Carolyn) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/13 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Chang on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Chang, Simon) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/13 8:52 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raiser, LLC, Uber USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Raiser, LLC, Uber USA LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/13 8:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/13 5:59 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/13/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/12 6:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth I. Schacter on behalf of Travis Kalanick, Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA LLC (aty to be noticed) (Schacter, Kenneth) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/12 4:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Gayed. Travis Kalanick served on 6/2/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/01 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Gayed. Raiser, LLC served on 5/30/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/01 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Gayed. Uber USA LLC served on 5/30/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/01 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Gayed. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 5/30/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Thu 06/01 2:08 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting plaintiff's motion2 for refund of fees paid electronically. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/1/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 05/25 8:51 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 05/25 8:48 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/25 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 05/24 3:33 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Jacqueline Gayed (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
2 | 2
motion
Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Wed 05/24 3:29 PM
Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Jacqueline Gayed. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
1 | 1
28
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against KALANICK TRAVIS, UBER Technologies inc, Uber USA LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9551756, filed by Gayed Jacqueline. (Anderson, Catherine) |
|
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 05/24 2:47 PM
NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. Also, forward any Summonses. These documents can be found under the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 05/25 8:46 AM
Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |