Tamra Camp v. County of Kern et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Jennifer L Thurston |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00715 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2017 1:14 AM PST |
Defendant
County of Kern
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kern County Probation Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David M. Kuge
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reyes Soberon, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamra Camp
Rodriguez & Associates 2020 Eye Street
Bakersfield, CA 93301 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 07/03 2:55 PM
ORDER Directing the Clerk to Close the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/3/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 07/03 8:59 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Tamra Camp. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/18 3:32 PM
ORDER AFTER28 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/18/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 7/9/2018. (Hall, S) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 06/14 11:08 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Tamra Camp. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 04/17 2:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/17/2018: In light of the information contained in the joint status report that discovery efforts are proceeding appropriately, the Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/23/2018 at 8:45 AM is VACATED. Counsel are reminded of their obligation to complete all discovery within the time frames set forth in the Scheduling Order. (Hall, S) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/13 3:18 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Reyes Soberon, Jr. (Gustafson, Brande) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Tue 02/06 4:22 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/6/2018. (Hall, S) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 02/05 9:20 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Tamra Camp. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/12 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Reyes Soberon, Jr. (Gustafson, Brande) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Statement
Fri 09/15 3:44 PM
STATEMENT of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure by Plaintiff Tamra Camp. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 08/25 9:06 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER20 to Stay Discovery Relating to Defendant Reyes Soberon, Jr., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2017. (Hall, S) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/24 11:28 AM
STIPULATION to Stay Discovery Relating to Defendant Reyes Soberon, Jr.; [proposed] Order by Reyes Soberon, Jr. (Weakley, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/23 4:23 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Reyes Soberon, Jr. Attorney Gustafson, Brande Lynn added. (Gustafson, Brande) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/23 8:36 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by County of Kern, Kern County Probation Department, David M. Kuge. (Fontes, Marshall) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 08/22 2:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/22/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 11/20/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 9/15/2017; Non-Expert 10/26/2018; Expert 1/8/2019. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/23/2018 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/22/2019; Hearing by 2/19/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/5/2019; Hearing by 4/16/2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 08/22 1:08 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/22/2017. Case SCHEDULED; Court to issue Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs Counsel Miguel Flores present. Defendants Counsel Marshall Fontes (telephonic) and James Weakley (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/FTR- Hall. (Hall, S) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Scheduling Report
Mon 08/14 1:29 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Tamra Camp. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/24 3:25 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Kern, Kern County Probation Department, David M. Kuge. Attorney Fontes, Marshall Scott added.(Fontes, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/20 11:13 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Reyes Soberon, Jr. Attorney Weakley, James D. added.(Weakley, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/20 8:08 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Kern County Probation Department Waiver sent on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/20 8:07 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: David M. Kuge Waiver sent on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/20 8:06 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Kern Waiver sent on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 06/05 2:50 PM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Reyes Soberon, Jr Waiver sent on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Whittington, Mark) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/02 9:30 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tamra Camp. Attorney Trujillo, Chantal Amber added. (Trujillo, Chantal) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil New Case Documents for LJO
Wed 05/24 9:49 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons
Wed 05/24 9:47 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Kern, Kern County Probation Department, David M. Kuge, Reyes Soberon, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Joseph Whittington* *Rodriguez & Associates* *2020 Eye Street* *Bakersfield, CA 93301*. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Tamra Camp (Whittington, Mark) | |
4 | 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Mark Joseph Whittington: Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Gonzalez, R) | |
3 | 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tamra Camp.(Whittington, Mark) | |
2 | 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Mark Whittington re1 Civil Cover Sheet: Your filing is entitled Civil Case Coversheet, however, the actual document attached is a Complaint. Please re-file your document using the correct event. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Gonzalez, R) | |
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Tamra Camp (Whittington, Mark) | |
PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-7075829. (Whittington, Mark) |