HomeCare Resource, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-41577
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-41577
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kathleen H Sanberg |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-41578 |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
HomeCare Resource, LLC
2740 American Blvd. West Suite 100
Bloomington, MN 55431 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
court
MNB Close bankruptcy case
Wed 08/29 3:57 PM
IT IS ORDERED: The case is closed and the trustee (if a trustee has been appointed) is discharged. (Chris MNBM) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Thu 06/28 6:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/28/2018 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 42729 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:29:01 ]. (admin) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
MNB Amended petition re: Name/address
Wed 12/27 7:09 AM
Amended petition re: Name/address filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
court
MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order
Wed 08/16 10:09 AM
Minutes re:30 Application for Compensation with hearing. No appearance, granted by default. Order to enter. (Carrie MNBM) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 07/28 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 07/28/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
MNB Joint administration - motion
Wed 07/26 2:05 PM
Order Granting Motion for joint administration of lead case 4:17-bk-41577 with member case 4:17-bk-41578. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Professional Resource Network, Inc., and HomeCare Resource, LLC. The docket in Case No 17-41577 should be consulted for all further documents filed and all matters affecting these cases. (LindaE QC MNBS) |
|
court
MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order
Wed 07/26 11:27 AM
Minutes re:29 Motion for joint administration. No appearance, granted by default. (Carrie MNBM) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
aplcn
MNB Application for compensation with hearing
Fri 07/07 9:23 AM
Application for compensation for Steven B Nosek, Debtor's Attorney. Period: 5/23/2017 to 6/30/2017, Fee: $6,440.00, Expenses: $1,841.70. An affidavit or verification, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 8/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
29 | 29
8
pgs
motion
MNB Motion for joint administration
Fri 07/07 9:04 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases 4:17-bk-41578, 17-41577 filed by Debtor 1 HomeCare Resource, LLC. An affidavit or verification, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 7/26/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
trustee
MNB Report of US Trustee of inability to appoint a creditors' committee
Thu 06/29 2:12 PM
Report of US Trustee of inability to appoint a creditors' committee. (Wencil, Sarah) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Wed 06/21 4:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/21/2017 1:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 14766 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:30:46 ]. (admin) |
|
27 | 27
order
MNB Motion to determine if patient care ombudsman is required- motion
Wed 06/21 2:31 PM
Order Granting motion to determine that appointment of patient care ombudsman is not necessary . Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM) |
|
26 | 26
order
MNB Employ professional - aplcn
Wed 06/21 1:06 PM
Order Granting Application to employ Peterson, Beyenhof & Zahler, Ltd. as Accountants for Debtor . Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM) |
|
court
MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order
Wed 06/21 4:15 PM
Minutes re:18 Motion to determine that appointment of patient care ombudsman is not necessary. Yvonne Doose appeared on behalf of the debtor. Motion granted. Order has been entered. (Lynn MNBM) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
trustee
MNB U. S. Trustee recommendation in favor of employment
Tue 06/20 3:46 PM
Notice of U. S. Trustee recommendation in favor of22 Application to employ professional. (Wencil, Sarah) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
MNB Employ professional - aplcn
Fri 06/16 10:58 AM
Order Granting Application to employ Steven B. Nosek and Yvonne R. Doose for HomeCare Resource, LLC . Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
MNB Signature declaration
Thu 06/15 1:52 PM
Signature declaration filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
23 | 23
misc
MNB Chapter 11 completion
Thu 06/15 1:51 PM
Chapter 11 completion for non-individual filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. List of creditors who have the twenty largest unsecured claims (Form 204), Summary of assets and liabilities for non-individuals (Form 206Sum), Schedules A/B, D - H (Forms 206A/B, 206D - 206H), Declaration under penalty of perjury for non-individual debtors (Form 202), Statement of financial affairs for non-individuals filing for bankruptcy (Form 207), Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor (Local Form 1007-1), List of equity security holders (if less than 101 holders), No new creditors added to case. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
misc
MNB Add creditor to matrix
Wed 06/14 9:55 AM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: US Bank. (Nosek, Steven) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
aplcn
MNB Application to employ professional
Tue 06/13 1:20 PM
Application to employ Peterson, Beyenhof & Zahler, Ltd. as Accountants for Debtor filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proposed order. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
Sunday, June 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/11 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 06/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
MNB Extend time to file schedules - aplcn
Fri 06/09 2:33 PM
Order Granting Application to extend time to file schedules (Shelia MNBM) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
aplcn
MNB Application to extend time to file schedules
Tue 06/06 9:52 AM
Application to extend time to file schedules filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. Proof of service, Proposed order. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
MNB Motion to determine that appointment of patient care ombudsman is not necessary
Fri 06/02 9:41 AM
Motion to determine that appointment of patient care ombudsman is not necessary filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. An affidavit or verification, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 6/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
17 | 17
misc
MNB Cash flow statement for small business
Fri 06/02 8:58 AM
Cash flow statement for small business (Nosek, Steven) |
|
16 | 16
misc
MNB Tax information for small business (federal income tax return)
Fri 06/02 8:09 AM
Tax information for small business (federal income tax return) filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
15 | 15
misc
MNB Statement of operations
Fri 06/02 8:08 AM
Statement of operations for small business (Nosek, Steven) |
|
14 | 14
misc
MNB Balance sheet
Fri 06/02 8:07 AM
Balance sheet filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
audio
MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing
Wed 05/31 5:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/31/2017 9:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 4689 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:46 ]. (admin) |
|
12 | 12
order
MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only)
Wed 05/31 11:26 AM
Order Granting Expedited Motion for Approval to Pay Prepetition Wages . Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM) |
|
court
MNB Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order
Wed 05/31 9:54 AM
Minutes re:9 Expedited Motion for Approval to Pay Prepetition Wages(first day motions only). Steven Nosek and Yvonne Doose appeared on behalf of the debtor. Motion granted. Order to be entered. (Lynn MNBM) |
||
Saturday, May 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/27 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors
Sat 05/27 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors. Notice Date 05/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
trustee
MNB U. S. Trustee recommendation in favor of employment
Fri 05/26 1:18 PM
Notice of U. S. Trustee recommendation in favor of6 Application to employ professional. (Wencil, Sarah) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only)
Thu 05/25 3:05 PM
Motion NOTICE OF EXPEDITED HEARING AND MOTION FOR APPROVAL TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES (first day) filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC . An affidavit or verification, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 5/31/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Shelia MNBM) |
|
8 | 8
court
MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Thu 05/25 12:29 PM
Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/29/2017 at 01:30 PM at Mtg Minneapolis, US Courthouse, 300 S 4th St, Rm 1017 (10th Floor). Last day to object to discharge is 8/28/2017. Proofs of Claims due by 9/27/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/27/2017. (Shelia MNBM) |
|
7 | 7
order
MNB Order reassigning chapter 11 case
Thu 05/25 11:32 AM
Order reassigning chapter 11 case. Involvement of Katherine A. Constantine terminated. Judge Kathleen H Sanberg added to case. (Sandy M MNBS) |
|
6 | 6
aplcn
MNB Application to employ professional
Thu 05/25 11:21 AM
Application to employ Steven B. Nosek and Yvonne R. Doose as Attorneys for Debtor filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proof of service, Proposed order. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
5 | 5
misc
MNB Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only)
Thu 05/25 11:03 AM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC (Nosek, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
misc
MNB Affidavit (Individual, not service)
Thu 05/25 10:32 AM
Affidavit filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
misc
MNB Proof of authority to sign and file petition
Thu 05/25 10:10 AM
Proof of authority to sign and file petition filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
misc
MNB Signature declaration
Thu 05/25 10:06 AM
Signature declaration filed by HomeCare Resource, LLC. (Nosek, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee)
Thu 05/25 10:06 AM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: HomeCare Resource, LLC. Fee Amount $1717.00. Incomplete Filings due by 06/8/2017. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 11/21/2017. Ch 11 Small Business Plan/Disclosure Statement deadline is 03/21/2018.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 06/26/2017 (Nosek, Steven) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/25 10:07 AM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-41578 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10017441. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
MNB Add creditor to matrix
Thu 05/25 10:15 AM
List of Creditors load 5 creditors added (ADIclerk) |
||
trustee
MNB Add attorney for US Trustee
Thu 05/25 11:18 AM
Attorney for US Trustee added to case. (Wencil, Sarah) |