Miller v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard P Stark |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00642 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2017 4:28 AM EST |
Defendant
Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/21 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nathaniel Miller as to Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC (Garibian, Antranig) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Tue 04/21 11:14 AM
CASE CLOSED (ntl) |
||
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 04/20 12:48 PM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a joint status report is due on or before April 27, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/20/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00642-LPS, 1:17-cv-00643-LPS (ntl) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 06/13 3:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC on 6/6/17, filed by Nathaniel Miller. (Garibian, Antranig) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/31 11:45 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00642-LPS, 1:17-cv-00643-LPS (rjb) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Fri 05/26 2:16 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/26 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2149817.) - filed by Nathaniel Miller.(jcs) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/26 2:16 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC on 5/26/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jcs) |