Telez v. American Airlines, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Phyllis J Hamilton |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-02926 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 18, 2017 2:13 AM PST |
Defendant
American Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Telez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/04 5:37 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018) |
|
27 | 27
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings Settlement Conference
Thu 01/04 4:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 1/4/2018. Matter fully settled; written agreement executed. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/4/2018) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings Settlement Conference
Tue 11/14 12:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Pre-settlement conference preparation call held on 11/14/2017. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2017) |
|
25 | 25
13
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 11/14 10:37 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 11/13 12:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Harrington, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Mon 10/16 2:50 PM
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/4/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/16/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017) |
|
22 | 22
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 10/16 2:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for an in-person settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 30-45 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 11/14/2017 10:00 AM. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
Mon 10/16 8:00 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017) |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
10
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/13 10:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/12/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/13 10:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/12/2017. Close of Fact Discovery by 2/14/2018. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2018 09:00 AM. Designation of Experts by 5/16/2018. Close of Expert Discovery by 7/18/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2018 02:00 PM. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 08:30 AM. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Wed 10/11 7:41 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on October 10, 2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Remark
Tue 10/03 1:53 PM
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled on October 6, 2017, has been RESCHEDULED to October 10, 2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Mon 09/25 10:07 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Friday, October 6, 2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 09/21 2:49 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Harrington, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
15 | 15
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Thu 09/21 2:43 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Harrington, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Wed 09/20 11:04 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harrington, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2017) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 08/07 10:48 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 12 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 08/04 3:22 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Sohrakoff, Alexis) (Filed on 8/4/2017) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/06 1:28 PM
ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Melodie Craft. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/06 9:02 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11523380.) filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Craft, Melodie) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/05 1:44 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/5/17. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 05/26 8:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 5/26/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017) | |
6 | 6 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by American Airlines, Inc. (Sohrakoff, Alexis) (Filed on 5/25/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). | |
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Jerome Telez. (McCormac, Kathleen) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). | |
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/23/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines, Inc.. (Sohrakoff, Alexis) (Filed on 5/23/2017) | |
2 | 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017) | |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (NO PROCESS); from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-17-558289. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11413094). Filed byAmerican Airlines, Inc..(Sohrakoff, Alexis) (Filed on 5/22/2017) Modified on 5/24/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Declaration OF ASILIA BACKUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL, | ||
Att: 2 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Answer to1 Removal Complaint; byAmerican Airlines, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017) |