District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ellen S Huvelle
Case #: 1:17-cv-01023
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1319 Clean Water Act
Case Filed:May 30, 2017
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2017 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
SCOTT PRUITT
Defendant
UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Plaintiff
POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB
Represented By
Jennifer C. Chavez
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER
Represented By
Jennifer C. Chavez
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
WARREN COUNTY CHAPTER OF THE IZAAK WALTON LEAGUE OF AMERICA
Represented By
Jennifer C. Chavez
Earthjustice
contact info
Plaintiff
POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, INC.
Represented By
Jennifer C. Chavez
Earthjustice
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/22/2017 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 10, 2017
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11:22 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 9/29/2017. Cross Motions due by 12/11/2017. Response to Cross Motions due by 1/17/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 2/12/2018. Summary Judgment motions due by 11/6/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/11/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/17/2018. (gdf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
16 16 motion Motion For Order Tue 3:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Order Cancelling Initial Scheduling Conference by POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB, POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, INC., SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER(Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 motion Briefing Schedule Tue 3:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB, POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, INC., SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER(Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Order on Motion for Order Tue 8:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting15 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule and granting16 Joint Motion for Order Cancelling Initial Scheduling Conference: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Scheduling Motion and Joint Motion to Cancel Initial Scheduling Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for August 15, 2017, is CANCELLED; and it is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply for proceedings in this case: Index to the Administrative Record is due by September 29, 2017; Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by November 6, 2017; Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due by December 11, 2017; Plaintiffs' Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due by January 17, 2018; and Defendants' Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment is due by February 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 8, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2017
14 14 order .Order Mon 7:54 AM
ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for August 15, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. Rule 16.3 report and proposed briefing schedule due by August 8, 2017. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 31, 2017. (AG)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10:31 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Meet & Confer Statement due by 8/8/2017. Initial Conference set for 8/15/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 3:56 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint, by SCOTT PRUITT, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. Related document:11 Amended Complaint, filed by POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, INC., SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER, POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB.(Greenfield, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB, POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER re5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11:30 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, SCOTT PRUITT filed by POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB, SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER.(Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Amended,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 12, 2017
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Mon 4:28 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2017. (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Mon 4:27 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/01/2017. (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 4:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT PRUITT served on 6/5/2017 (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 4:22 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/5/2017 (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 3:09 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, SCOTT PRUITT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by WARREN COUNTY CHAPTER OF THE IZAAK WALTON LEAGUE OF AMERICA. (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB. (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER. (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER. (Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, SCOTT PRUITT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4969671) filed by POTOMAC RIVERKEEPER, POTOMAC RIVER SMALLMOUTH CLUB, SHENANDOAH RIVERKEEPER, WARREN COUNTY CHAPTER OF THE IZAAK WALTON LEAGUE OF AMERICA.(Chavez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 3:02 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (jd)
Related: [-]