Alvarado-Aguilera v. USA
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Referred: | Bridget S Bade |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01652 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/16 3:22 PM
ORDER of USCA: The applicants "Petition for a Certificate of Appealability to File a Second Motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255," opened as case no. 17-73115 is treated as an application for authorization to file a second or successive section 2255 motion. The applications are denied. (Copies mailed by Ninth Circuit)(DXD) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 04/05 10:18 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED adopting the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as the order of this court; defendant's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence shall be referred to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 22-3(a). (SLQ) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/05 10:13 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Bade's R&R (Doc.15 ) is accepted and adopted as the order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.11 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Second or Successive Motion, titled Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 (Doc.1 ), shall be referred to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 22-3(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/4/18.(SLQ) |
|
Att: 1 2255 Motion | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 01/08 4:20 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Court GRANT Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.11 ), and transfer the second or successive 2255 motion to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals as a second or successive motion, and administratively close this case. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 1/8/18. (LAD) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 11/17 8:23 AM
Letter from Luis Alberto Alvarado-Aguilera re: Petition for Certificate of Appealability. (SLQ) (1 page) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Wed 10/25 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Luis Alberto Alvarado-Aguilera: #03461408, Big Spring Correctional Center - Cedar Hill Unit, 3711 Wright Ave, Big Spring TX 79720. (KAS) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order
Wed 10/18 4:28 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of the date of this order, Defendant shall file a response to the government's amended motion to dismiss. (Doc.11 .) The government may file a reply within fourteen days of service of Defendant's response. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 10/18/17. (SLQ) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 10/18 11:57 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Amended Motion To Dismiss by USA. (Afshari, Brooke) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/17 1:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by USA. (Afshari, Brooke) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/08 2:46 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for the government to file a response to Movant's motion tovacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is extended to October 23,2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 09/08/2017.(KAS) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/08 8:16 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA.(Afshari, Brooke) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
Tue 08/29 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Brooke Afshari appearing for USA. Attorney Ryan Jeffery Goldstein terminated. . (Afshari, Brooke) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/29 11:58 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Luis Alberto Alvarado Aguilera. Reason for return: Unable to Forward. Document number 3. (KAS) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Tue 08/08 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Luis Alberto Alvarado-Aguilera: #03461-408, Big Spring Correctional Institute, Flightline Unit, 2001 Rickabaugh Dr., Big Spring, TX 79720. (ATD) (1 page) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
Thu 07/27 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Ryan Goldstein appearing for USA. Attorney Brooke Terry Afshari terminated. . (Goldstein, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 07/25 12:31 PM
ORDER - The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the § 2255 Motion (Doc.1 in CV 17-01652 PHX-DJH (BSB)) and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the § 2255 Motion in the civil case. The United States Attorney for the District of Arizona or his designee has 60 days from the date of service within which to answer the § 2255 Motion. Movant may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer to the § 2255 Motion. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/24/17. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 05/30 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (HLA) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 05/30 9:27 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR-15-889-PHX-DJH-1 filed by Luis Alberto Alvarado-Aguilera. (12 pages)(HLA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |