TIMS et al v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03845 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2017 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
|
|
Notice Only
JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION
CLERK OF THE PANEL ONE COLUMBUS CIRCLE, NE THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIARY BUIDLING ROOM G-255 - NORTH LOBBY
WASHINGTON, DC 20002 |
|
Plaintiff
CLERA MAE TIMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KELVIN TIMS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/30 5:52 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (mxw) |
||
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 11/15 10:18 AM
Short-Form ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service by MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION.(HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/16 1:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CLERA MAE TIMS, KELVIN TIMS.(FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Sunday, April 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sun 04/15 9:02 AM
Short-Form ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Certificate of Service by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP.(HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
9
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/06 10:23 AM
MDL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER #2. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/23/17. (gh, ) |
|
7 | 7
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/06 10:22 AM
MDL INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/15/17. (gh, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Fri 06/30 11:20 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 (MASTER DOCKET). Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/28/17. (jl) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 06/29 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference held in Chambers on 6/27/2017. (jl, ) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 06/02 12:19 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/14/2017. (ek) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 06/01 9:27 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca LP. Attorney DEBRA M. PERRY for ASTRAZENECA LP,DEBRA M. PERRY for ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP added. (PERRY, DEBRA) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/01 9:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (PERRY, DEBRA) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/01 12:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLERA MAE TIMS, KELVIN TIMS. ASTRAZENECA LP waiver sent on 6/1/2017, answer due 7/31/2017; ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP waiver sent on 6/1/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/31 4:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Donato Marucci* (dam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/31 12:08 PM
COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7869376) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CLERA MAE TIMS, KELVIN TIMS.(FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 05/31 4:19 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, ) |