Cohen v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01740 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2017 3:42 AM CST |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
Gary McConnell O MegaBldg
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 |
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Merck & Co., Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Carl Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago |
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
17
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/15 2:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/14/2019. (HAZ) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Tue 10/22 4:07 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re13 Stipulation of Dismissal.(Solow, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/22 4:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule FRCP 41 by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc..(Solow, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/27 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Keith Solow on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc.. (Solow, Andrew) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 07/27 5:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF DARRELL SLAVEN in case 0:14-cv-05021-JRT; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Russell Wills Budd and Thomas M Sims terminated in case 0:15-cv-04567-JRT. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/27/2018. Associated Cases: 0:15-md-02642-JRT et al.(JMK) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/25 9:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Pharma AG. (MMP) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons
Mon 07/24 3:16 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Bayer Pharma AG. (Richards, R) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons
Mon 07/24 3:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Bayer Pharma AG. (Richards, R) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/23 6:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form Complaint) against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Merck & Co., Inc.. filed by Carl Cohen. No summons requested. (Richards, R) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 6:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by R Jason Richards on behalf of Carl Cohen. (Richards, R) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/31 9:36 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642 (JRT). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at:[LINK:http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Fluoroquinolone/index.shtml] . (lmb) |
|
4 | 4
order
Protective Order
Wed 05/31 9:36 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/25/2016. (lmb) |
|
3 | 3
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 05/31 9:24 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-02127. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL List. |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order [CTO-83] Re: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the U.S. Judicial Panel on MDL, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. section 1407 to the District of Minnesota for the reasons stated in the order of 8/17/15, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/31/2017.] | |
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER AG, BAYER PHARMA AG, MERCK & CO., INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE159416), filed by CARL COHEN.(jmv, ) (jmv, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/31/2017.] | |
Att: 1 (5/10/2017) Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 (5/10/2017) Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 3 (5/10/2017) Designation Form | ||
Summons Issued as to BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER AG, BAYER PHARMA AG, MERCK & CO., INC. Forwarded To: 5 Origs mailed to counsel on 5/10/17 (jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/31/2017.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CARL COHEN. (jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/31/2017.] |