Williams Seafood Restaurant, Inc.
Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Edward J Coleman III |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40819 |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Williams Seafood Restaurant, Inc.
8010 US Highway 80 E
Savannah, GA 31410-2938 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
Johnson Square Business Center 2 East Bryan Street, Ste 725
Savannah, GA 31401 |
Docket last updated: 06/01/2017 8:00 PM EDT |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/02 6:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-40819 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 14586446. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/02 6:31 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Williams Seafood Restaurant, Inc. Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 6/16/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 6/16/2017. Attorney Signature Exhibit B due 6/16/2017. Debtor Signature re: Relief Availability due 6/16/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 6/16/2017. Inventory of Property due 6/16/2017. Schedule A/B due 6/16/2017. Schedule C due 6/16/2017. Schedule D due 6/16/2017. Schedule E/F due 6/16/2017. Schedule G due 6/16/2017. Schedule H due 6/16/2017. Schedule I due 6/16/2017. Schedule J due 6/16/2017. Schedule J-2 due 6/16/2017. Schedules A/B-J due 6/16/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/16/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 6/16/2017.Means Test Form Due: 6/16/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 6/16/2017 Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/29/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2017. (Drake, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Mon 06/05 10:33 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by James L Drake Jr. on behalf of Williams Seafood Restaurant, Inc. (CMM) |