Staggs v. Fuyao Glass America, Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Newman |
Referred: | Michael J Newman |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00191 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2017 5:03 AM EST |
Defendant
Fuyao Glass America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Staggs
|
Represented By
|
1. | Two more former workers join lawsuit against Fuyao in an effort to recover lost wages and overtime pay (daytondailynews.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/31/2017 | |
2. | Lawsuit filed against Fuyao alleging workers were not compensated for working over 40 hours a week (fox45now.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/07/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago |
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
143 | 143
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 12/16 2:13 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by on 12/16/2019. (srb) |
|
142 | 142
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order to
Mon 12/16 2:12 PM
ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT (DOC.140 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/16/2019. (srb) |