Mize v. Wal-Mart Realty Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Christine M Arguello |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01355 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 01, 2017 2:34 AM MST |
Defendant
Walmart Real Estate Business Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicki Mize
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/01 10:12 AM
ORDER re:27 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case. The Court hereby ORDERS that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/31/2017. (athom, ) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal of Case
Tue 10/31 4:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Vicki Mize.(Coulter, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/07 2:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/07/2017. Discovery due by 3/5/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/7/2018. (mdave, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 09/06 11:43 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 9/6/2017, Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2018 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED: The correct name of the defendant is Walmart Real Estate Business Trust. The Clerks office shall correct the record. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 08/29 2:02 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Wal-Mart Realty Company. (Campbell, Stacey) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minute Order
Thu 08/24 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2017 will commence 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Minute Order
Fri 08/18 2:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/18/2017. Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/03 12:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Realty Company. (Gambill, Allison) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/03 9:46 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/3/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Tue 08/01 4:19 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-01355-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) |
|
18 | 18
order
Minute Order
Tue 08/01 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/1/2017 re:17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Wal-Mart Realty Company. All parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, ) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/31 11:29 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Wal-Mart Realty Company All parties do not consent.. (Gambill, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 07/26 11:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/26/2017 granting15 Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/11/2017 is vacated and rescheduled to 9/5/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Vacate
Tue 07/25 2:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant Wal-Mart Realty Company.(Gambill, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/19 10:48 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Wal-Mart Realty Company.(Gambill, Allison) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 06/29 9:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Response to Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/29/2017. Wal-Mart Realty Company answer due 7/19/2017. (mdave, ) |
|
12 | 12
order
Minute Order
Thu 06/29 8:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/29/2017. Consent Form due by 7/31/2017. (mdave, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wed 06/28 1:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, by Defendant Wal-Mart Realty Company.(Gambill, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 06/28 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stacey Alan Campbell on behalf of Wal-Mart Realty CompanyAttorney Stacey Alan Campbell added to party Wal-Mart Realty Company(pty:dft) (Campbell, Stacey) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 06/28 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison L. Gambill on behalf of Wal-Mart Realty CompanyAttorney Allison L. Gambill added to party Wal-Mart Realty Company(pty:dft) (Gambill, Allison) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 06/22 7:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vicki Mize. Wal-Mart Realty Company served on 6/14/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Coulter, Lori) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minute Order
Tue 06/13 2:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Mon 06/12 11:28 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Mon 06/12 11:27 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-01355-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Memorandum Returning Case
Mon 06/12 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 06/05 9:35 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (dbera, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Sunday, June 04, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 06/05 9:31 AM
Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 06/04 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Realty Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5549070)Attorney Lori J. Coulter added to party Vicki Mize(pty:pla), filed by Vicki Mize.(Coulter, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |