Clark et al v. Knickrehm et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02091 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 02, 2017 3:53 AM CST |
Defendant
Patsy Chase
|
|
Defendant
Carol Gillis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nikkole Hurst
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kurt Knickrehm
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robbie McKay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Debbie Williams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dick Pickarts
|
|
Defendant
Richard Weiss
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Arkansas Department of Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Haller Nava
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Lee Reichard Emmett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Fenton Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi O'Hara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Clark
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lisa Garretson
Terminated: 08/15/2017
1214 Mays Branch Road
Van Buren, AR 72956 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charla Beaumont Viens
Terminated: 08/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Garretson
Terminated: 08/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Sharp Burkholder
Terminated: 08/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Seven sexual assault victims file negligence lawsuit against ex-employees of Arkansas Department of Human Services (swtimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/07/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
114 | 114
order
Judgment
Tue 01/16 10:31 AM
JUDGMENT; The claims of Plaintiffs Rachel Clark, Christopher Wayne Reichard, Amanda Sharp Burkholder, Nicole Haller Nava, Brandi O'Hara, Ashley Fenton Price, Charla Beaumont Viens, and Amber Lee Reichard Emmett are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Further, Plaintiff H.B.'s claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 16, 2018. (mjm) |
|
113 | 113
23
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Supplement Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 01/16 10:24 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting88 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, see Order for specifics. Granting in part and denying in part90 Motion to Dismiss and111 Motion to Dismiss, as set forth. Further, finding as moot82 Motion for Leave to Serve by Publication and finding as moot106 Motion to Extend Time for Service. This case is DISMISSED. Judgment will enter concurrently with this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 16, 2018. (mjm) |