Walnut Hill Physicians Hospital, LLC
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Stacey G Jernigan |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-32255 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2022 |
Debtor
Walnut Hill Physicians' Hospital, LLC
7502 Greenville Ave
Dallas, TX 75231-3802 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Walnut Hill Physicians Hospital, LLC
7502 Greenville Ave
Dallas, TX 75231-3802 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Scott M. Seidel
Seidel Law Firm 6505 W. Park Blvd., Suite 306
Plano, TX 75093 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 10/31/2022 2:54 PM CDT |
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign
Tue 06/06 12:13 AM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/12/2017 at 10:40 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. (Schwartz, John) |
||
Receipt of filing fee for Receipt number and filing fee 17-32255 bjh7) ( 335.00). Receipt number 23796780, amount $ 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice 17-32255 bjh7) [motion,mprohac] ( 25.00). Receipt number 23798412, amount $ 25.00 . (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice 17-32255 bjh7) [motion,mprohac] ( 25.00). Receipt number 23799328, amount $ 25.00 . (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer)
Tue 06/06 12:10 AM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Filed by Walnut Hill Physicians' Hospital, LLC (Schwartz, John) (12 pgs; 3 docs) |
|
Att: 1 Board Resolutions | ||
Att: 2 Declaration for Electronic Filing | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of deficiency
Tue 06/06 10:08 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/20/2017. Schedule D due 6/20/2017. Schedule E/F due 6/20/2017. Schedule G due 6/20/2017. Schedule H due 6/20/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/20/2017. Creditor matrix due 6/8/2017.Statement of Income/Means Test Form due 6/20/2017. (Levario, Tandi) (2 pgs) |
|
3 | 3 Motion to appear pro hac vice for Brian Sirower. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor Capital One, National Association (Sirower, Brian) (2 pgs) | |
4 | 4 Motion to appear pro hac vice for John A. Harris. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor Capital One, National Association (Blacker, Monica) (2 pgs) | |
5 | 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Brian Sirower, Monica Susan Blacker filed by Creditor Capital One, National Association. (Blacker, Monica) (4 pgs) |