Griffin Regency, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-04920
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-04920
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine Peek Mcewen |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-04921 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Nov 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Griffin Regency, LLC
1423 Lake Shore Dr
Sarasota, FL 34231-3438 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/13 7:18 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Deborah K.) |
||
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate Of Service
Fri 11/15 9:23 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Dismissing Case - Copy of Certificate of Service entered in Lead Case 8:17-bk-4920-CPM/Moorings Regency, LLC (Doc. No. 401). Filed by Ryan C Reinert on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-IQ12 . (Deborah K.) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case (BK cases only)
Fri 11/15 9:19 AM
Order Dismissing Case - Copy of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case of Griffin Regency, LLC by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Morgan Stanley Capital I Inc., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-IQ12 entered in Lead Case 8:17-bk-4920-CPM/Moorings Regency, LLC (Doc. No. 397) .. Service Instructions: Ryan Reinert is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Thu 06/28 8:48 AM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 27, 2018 by Attorney Michael C. Markham of Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP - 401 East Jackson Street, Suite 3100 - Tampa, FL 33602. (Sara M.) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice Of Change of Address - Debtor
Tue 01/30 11:30 AM
Notice of Change of Address of the Debtor Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC. (Markham, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded
Thu 07/13 8:25 AM
The trustee appointed in this case states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 7/12/2017 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Wheatley, Nathan) |
||
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Non-Appointment of Creditors' Committee
Thu 07/13 8:25 AM
Until further notice, the United States Trustee will not appoint a committee of creditors pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1102 because of an insufficient number of unsecured creditors willing or able to serve on an unsecured creditors committee. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Wheatley, Nathan) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Equity Security Holders
Tue 06/27 5:14 PM
Summary of Assets , Schedules A - J and Summary of Assets, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs , List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC . (Markham, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Tue 06/27 5:14 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(8:17-bk-04921-CPM) [misc,schaja] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 54084259, Amount Paid $ 31.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
court
Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB)
Fri 06/23 1:27 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Michael Markham for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, . (Dana B.) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information
Tue 06/20 3:57 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC (Markham, Michael) |
|
Saturday, June 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 06/11 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 06/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Sun 06/11 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 06/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 06/11 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 06/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Thu 06/08 5:32 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Schedules A,B and D-H, Summary of Assets, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules, and Case Management Summary . (Juan) |
|
8 | 8
court
Notice Of Deficient Filing
Thu 06/08 5:27 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Schedules A,B and D-H, Summary of Assets, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules, and Case Management Summary . (Juan) |
|
7 | 7
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Thu 06/08 5:25 PM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/12/2017 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL (861) - Room 100-B, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Proofs of Claims due by 9/25/2017. (Juan) |
|
misc
Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY)
Thu 06/08 10:35 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC . (Markham, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Wed 06/07 9:15 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
5 | 5
order
Joint Administration
Wed 06/07 3:00 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b). The cases shall be jointly administered; In re Moorings Regency, LLC, Case No. 8-17-bk-4920-CPM is designated as the lead case . This case is associated with lead case 8:17-bk-4920. . Service Instructions: Michael Markham is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.) |
|
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Wed 06/07 9:09 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.) |
||
court
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases
Wed 06/07 3:06 PM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 8-17-bk-4920-CPM EXCEPT: Lists of Creditors Pursuant to Rule 1007(d), Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs (and any amendments thereto), Monthy Operating Reports (and any objections thereto), and if Separate Plans are Filed, Ballots. Claims filed shall indicate only the case name and number of the case in which the claim is asserted . (Deborah K.) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Tue 06/06 2:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:17-bk-04920 with 8:17-bk-04921, 8:17-bk-04922 Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC (Markham, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Tue 06/06 2:41 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC. (Markham, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 06/06 2:39 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Debtor Griffin Regency, LLC. (Markham, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 06/06 2:14 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Griffin Regency, LLC. (Markham, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Tue 06/06 2:20 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-04921) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 53860530, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Tue 06/06 9:01 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |