Grace Church Restaurant Corp.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-bk-22907 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Dismissed: | May 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Grace Church Restaurant Corp.
40 Grace Church St
Port Chester, NY 10573-4952 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 05/29 1:56 PM
Case Closed. (Correa, Mimi) |
||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Operating Report
Mon 05/14 3:44 PM
Operating Report /Statement of Disbursements for the period December 1, 2017 through May 7, 2018 Filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Alter, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss
Thu 05/10 12:20 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss . Notice Date 05/09/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Motion, Dismiss Case
Mon 05/07 2:32 PM
Order signed on 5/7/2018 Dismissing Chapter 11 Case . (Walker, Justin) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 05/07 4:35 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Case Dismissed. (Walker, Justin) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Motion, Dismiss Case
Mon 04/09 9:52 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1112(b) and 305(a) with Notice of Hearing filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp. with hearing to be held on 5/3/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. (Alter, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice, Appearance
Mon 04/02 7:49 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey K. Cymbler on behalf of NYS Department of Taxation & Finance. (Cymbler, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Operating Report
Tue 12/19 10:24 AM
Monthly Operating Report for November 2017 Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Operating Report
Tue 12/19 10:22 AM
Monthly Operating Report for October 2017 Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Operating Report
Mon 10/30 11:42 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the period ending September 30, 2017 Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Operating Report
Mon 10/30 11:40 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the period ending August 31, 2017 Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Motion, Relief from Stay (fee)
Tue 10/03 4:21 PM
Order signed 10/3/2017 Granting Motion of FKAL Management Corp. for Relief from Stay . (Logue Togher, Claire) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/22 12:53 PM
Certificate of Service Reply of FKAL Management Corporation in Further Support of Its Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by Ashley M Koenen on behalf of FKAL Management Corp.. (Koenen, Ashley) |
|
25 | 25
answer
Reply
Fri 09/22 10:46 AM
Reply to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by Ashley M Koenen on behalf of FKAL Management Corp.. (Koenen, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Opposition
Tue 09/19 10:08 AM
Opposition /Debtor's Opposition to FKAL Management Corporation's Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 362(d)(1),(d)(2) and (d)(4) filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. with hearing to be held on 9/26/2017 (check with court for location) (Alter, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A and B | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/08 4:20 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of FKAL Management Corp.. (Chiu, Conrad) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Motion, Relief from Stay (fee)
Fri 09/08 4:13 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay . FKAL Management Corporation's Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 362(d)(1), (d)(2) And (d)(4) filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of FKAL Management Corp. with hearing to be held on 9/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Responses due by 9/19/2017,. (Chiu, Conrad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 13 Notice of Motion | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/08 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notice and Papers filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of FKAL Management Corp.. (Chiu, Conrad) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 09/08 4:25 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee) 17-22907 rdd) [motion,185] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12097665. Fee amount 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 08/24 9:47 AM
Notice of Hearing /Case Conference Adjourned from August 29, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to September 26, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. with hearing to be held on 9/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Operating Report
Thu 08/03 12:14 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the period ending July 31, 2017 Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/25 11:14 AM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Deadline Requiring Filing of Proofs of Claim on or Before September 6, 2017 Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order, Setting Last Day to File Claims
Fri 07/21 1:32 PM
Order Signed on 7/14/2017 Granting Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim . Proofs of Claim due by 9/6/2017. (Correa, Mimi) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 07/19 11:38 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing from July 17,2017 to August 29, 2017 filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Alter, Bruce) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Tue 07/18 8:47 AM
Order Signed on 7/14/2017 Granting Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim . Proofs of Claim due by 9/6/2017. (Li, Dorothy) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Operating Report
Fri 07/14 9:32 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the period ending June 30, 2017 Filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Alter, Bruce) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Application, Employ
Mon 06/26 1:11 PM
Order signed 6/26/2017 Authorizing and Approving Retention of Alter & Brescia, LLP as Attorneys for Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc as of 6/6/2017 . (Logue Togher, Claire) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Application, Employ
Mon 06/26 10:11 AM
Application to Employ Alter & Brescia, LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel , Nunc Pro Tunc, as of June 6, 2017 filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Bruce R. Alter | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Third Party Payor | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Wed 06/21 10:22 AM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim with Notice of Presentment scheduled for July 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 06/21 10:07 AM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Initial Case Management Conference and Order Scheduling Initial Case Conference Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp..(Brescia, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Creditors | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 06/20 12:19 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Dana Patricia Brescia on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Brescia, Dana) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Tue 06/20 11:06 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Declaration Concerning Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorney Disclosure Statement. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b)) - Form 2030
Mon 06/19 4:06 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules - Non-Individual , Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 , Matrix /Amended Matrix with Verification Filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Alter, Bruce) |
|
Sunday, June 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Mon 06/12 12:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 06/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Sat 06/10 12:24 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 06/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
Fri 06/09 8:37 AM
REISSUED TO CHANGE MEETING TIME FROM 1:00 PM TO 1:30 PM: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/19/2017 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (Room 243A, White Plains Courthouse). (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/08 6:38 PM
Order Signed on 6/8/2017 Scheduling Initial Case Conference with hearing to be held on 7/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. (Li, Dorothy) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
Wed 06/07 12:14 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/19/2017 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (Room 243A, White Plains Courthouse). (Vargas, Ana) |
|
misc
Case Association -Related
Wed 06/07 12:09 PM
Case Related to 15-22787 rdd Grace Church Realty Corp. . (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Wed 06/07 12:11 PM
Pending Deadline for Employee Income Record Terminated. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Wed 06/07 12:13 PM
Deficiencies Set: Statement of Operations Due: 6/20/2017. Balance Sheet Due Date:6/20/2017. Cash Flow Statement Due:6/20/2017. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 06/13/2017 Incomplete Filings due by 6/20/2017. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Tue 06/06 4:32 PM
Affidavit Under Rule 1007-2 of the Local Rules Filed by Bruce R. Alter on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp..(Alter, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 List of 20 largest unsecured creditors | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 06/06 4:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 06/20/2017. Schedule D due 06/20/2017. Schedule E/F due 06/20/2017. Schedule G due 06/20/2017. Schedule H due 06/20/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 06/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/20/2017. Atty Disclosure State. due 06/20/2017. Employee Income Record Due: 06/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 06/20/2017, Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/2/2018, Filed by Bruce R. Alter of Alter & Brescia, LLP on behalf of Grace Church Restaurant Corp.. (Alter, Bruce) |