Martinez v. Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03401 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2017 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Camacho
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Irma Varner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yariza Martinez
|
Represented By
|
1. | Former teacher aid files lawsuit, claims she was fired from Brooklyn Daycare due to her pregnancy (dnainfo.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/13 4:05 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersignedcounsel for the parties herein, who have been authorized by their respective clients to execute this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice, that the above-captioned litigation by Plaintiff Yariza Martinez is hereby withdrawn and shall be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, without an award of attorneys' fees, costs or disbursements to either party. So Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 3/13/2018. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Sunday, March 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Sun 03/11 1:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and without Costs by Yariza Martinez (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Transcript
Fri 02/09 11:03 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 23, 2018, before Judge LEVY. Court Reporter/Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (Hong, Loan) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Tue 01/30 12:03 PM
Letter re: Status Report by Yariza Martinez (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 01/24 11:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Silvia Stanciu, Bryan Arce, with plaintiff Yaritza Martinez; Noa Baddish and Vanessa Avello, with Irma Varner and Robert Camacho. After extensive settlement negotiations, this case has settled. The material terms and conditions of the settlement were placed on the record. [3:24-3:30]Defendants confirmed that they were authorized by the board to enter into the settlement agreement. Each of the parties stated that they fully understood the terms and conditions of the settlement and they were entering into it voluntarily. Counsel and the parties confirmed that they have agreed to all the material terms and conditions of the settlement and that this settlement is now a binding a agreement. The parties intend to reduce the agreement to writing. A stipulation of dismissal shall be filed within 30 days.Settlement Conference held on 1/23/2018 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 12/07 5:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Silvia Stanciu, Noa Baddish. Settlement issues discussed. Counsel will exchange the information discussed at this conference. Ex parte pre-settlement conference statements faxed to chambers by 1/18/18. Settlement conference with clients with settlement authority 1/23/18 at 12:30 in Courtroom 11B.Settlement Conference held on 12/7/2017 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 12/06 1:22 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Yariza Martinez. (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 12/06 5:43 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference scheduled for 12/7/17 at 4:30 is converted into a pre-settlement telephone conference at the same time. Counsel should be prepared to discuss procedural, logistical and substantive issues at that conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/6/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 12/06 4:38 PM
MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: The Court held a pre-motion conference on December 5, 2017 concerning Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss the complaint. Silvia Stanciu appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Noa Baddish appeared on behalf of Defendant. Briefing of Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss will be held in abeyance. The Court respectfully refers the parties to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy for a settlement conference. No later than one week after the settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Levy, the parties shall file a status report. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/5/2017. (Valentin, Winnethka) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/28 6:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the pre-motion conference previously scheduled for November 29, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED to December 5, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/28/2017. (Figueroa, Tiffani) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 11/17 3:04 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference dated November 17 2017 by Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc.. (Baddish, Noa) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 11/17 4:07 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/17/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 11/17 4:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER RE16 The initial conference set for 11/21/17 is adjourned to 12/7/2017 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/17/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 10/18 3:20 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's letter motion15 to adjourn the pre-motion conference scheduled for October 27, 2017 is GRANTED. The Court shall hold a pre-motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the complaint on November 29, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4H North. The Court will order a briefing schedule during the pre-motion conference. The parties should anticipate a schedule that will require service of the motion within a short time after the pre-motion conference (usually two weeks). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/18/2017. (Valentin, Winnethka) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 10/17 4:00 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Yariza Martinez. (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 10/12 11:50 AM
ORDER: Defendants' letter request12 for a pre-motion conference is GRANTED. The Court shall hold a pre-motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the complaint on October 27, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4H North. The Court will order a briefing schedule during the pre-motion conference. The parties should anticipate a schedule that will require service of the motion within a short time after the pre-motion conference (usually two weeks). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/12/2017. (Valentin, Winnethka) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 10/06 3:38 PM
Letter Opposition to Defendants' Request for Permission to File a 12(b)(6) Motion and Pre-Motion Conference in Lieu of Answer by Yariza Martinez (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/02 3:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc., Robert Camacho, Irma Varner (Baddish, Noa) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Mon 10/02 3:13 PM
Letter Letter Requesting Permission to File a Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Pre-Motion Conference (in lieu of Answer) by Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc., Robert Camacho, Irma Varner (Baddish, Noa) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/02 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Noa M Baddish on behalf of Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc., Robert Camacho, Irma Varner (aty to be noticed) (Baddish, Noa) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/15 4:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/15/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/08 9:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yariza Martinez. Robert Camacho waiver sent on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/08 9:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yariza Martinez. Irma Varner waiver sent on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/08 9:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yariza Martinez. Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc. waiver sent on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/02 9:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yariza Martinez. Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc. served on 7/20/2017, answer due 8/10/2017. (Phillips, William) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/30 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yariza Martinez. Robert Camacho served on 6/19/2017, answer due 7/10/2017; Irma Varner served on 6/19/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. (Phillips, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/07 4:47 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/07 4:46 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 4:46 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/06 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Bushwick Improvement Society, Inc., Robert Camacho, Irma Varner filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9582750 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yariza Martinez. (Stanciu, Silvia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/07 4:44 PM
Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |