Clark v. Schwarze et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Davis |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01973 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 05, 2017 3:34 AM CST |
Defendant
Officer Dustin Schwarze
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Mark Ringgenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Clark
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal Lawsuit Filed Against Two Minneapolis Officers Involved In Jamar Clark's Death (minnesota.cbslocal.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/12/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
95 | 95
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Mon 09/16 10:37 AM
JUDGMENT(KNK)cc: Jonathan G. Lebedoff on 9/16/2019 (KNK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
94 | 94
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/12 2:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Written Opinion)Based on the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal, case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/12/2019. (CFD) |
|
93 | 93
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Thu 09/12 11:25 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re92 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Sarff, Kristin) |
|
92 | 92
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/12 11:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark Ringgenberg. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff James Clark, Trustee. (Sarff, Kristin) |