Tank Wind-Down Corp.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11292
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11292
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11293 |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CST Industries, Inc.
903 E 104th St Ste 900
Kansas City, MO 64131-3451 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
5
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/19 8:50 AM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases and Dismissing Without Prejudice Adversary Proceeding No. 17-51802 Signed on 8/12/2019. (SJS) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 08/19 8:51 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS) |
||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/16 1:51 PM
Order Granting Motion to Authorize Change of Case Captions. An Order has been entered in Case No. 17-11292 directing that the caption of these jointly administered cases be changed in accordance with the corporate name change of CST Industries Holdings Inc. to Tank Holdings Wind-Down Corp.; CST Industries, Inc. to Tank Wind-Down Corp.; and CST Power and Construction, Inc. to Power Wind Down Corp.. Signed on 5/11/2018 (SJS) Modified text on 5/16/2018 (SJS) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 09/14 9:52 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue. (Momjian, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 09/01 3:32 PM
[SEALED] Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 09/01 3:24 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (REDACTED) Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 09/01 3:06 PM
[SEALED] Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 09/01 2:54 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. (REDACTED) Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 08/09 8:27 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (REDACTED) Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 08/09 8:24 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. (REDACTED Schedules for CST Industries, Inc.) Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 08/09 9:53 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 08/09 9:51 AM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (Slaugh, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 06/13 4:11 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors Related Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases commenced concurrently by CST Industries Holdings Inc. and the debtors in the above-captioned cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of CST Industries Holdings Inc., Case No. 17-11292 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 6/13/2017 (SJS) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 06/12 7:56 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
List of Creditors
Fri 06/09 8:05 PM
List of Creditors // Creditor Matrix Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Verification of Creditor Matrix | ||
3 | 3
13
pgs
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Fri 06/09 7:21 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by CST Industries Holdings Inc., CST Industries, Inc., CST Power & Construction, Inc.. (Ryan, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/09 7:10 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11293 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8479389, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/09 7:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by CST Industries, Inc.. (Ryan, Jeremy) |