KWCO, PC v. VG Life Sciences, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David Counts |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00116 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 4:04 AM CST |
Defendant
MedBridge Development Company, LLC
121 Gray Avenue, Suite 200
San Barbara, CA 93101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KWCO, PC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
VG Life Sciences, Inc.
Terminated: 09/28/2017
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/10 10:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 01/23 8:32 AM
It is ORDERED that the Parties' Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Doc.38 filed January 16, 2018, is GRANTED. All discovery proceedings in this case are stayed until further notice of the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Sat 01/20 12:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Counts for all proceedings. Judge Robert A. Junell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jk) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Stay
Tue 01/16 2:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by MedBridge Development Company, LLC.(Fasthoff, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 01/05 11:29 AM
Text Order DENYING37 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. Nowhere in the Motion does counsel indicate whether this motion is opposed or that he has conferred with opposing counsel as required by Local Rule CV-7(I). Entered by Judge Robert A. Junell. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Stay
Wed 01/03 10:32 AM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Proceedings by MedBridge Development Company, LLC.(Fasthoff, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 12/18 2:35 PM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (se) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 12/15 5:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 12/01 2:07 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 11/21 3:00 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by KWCO, PC, re30 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of KWCO filed under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant MedBridge Development Company, LLC (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 11/08 3:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by MedBridge Development Company, LLC, re30 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of KWCO filed under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant MedBridge Development Company, LLC (Fasthoff, Henry) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 11/01 4:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by KWCO, PC, re30 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of KWCO filed under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant MedBridge Development Company, LLC(Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/18 11:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of KWCO filed under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by MedBridge Development Company, LLC.(Fasthoff, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of David Odell | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 10/05 11:06 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by KWCO, PC, re16 MOTION to Dismiss under Rules 9(b), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant MedBridge Development Company, LLC(Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/02 10:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MedBridge Development Company, LLC amending1 Complaint, filed by KWCO, PC(Brannan, Stephen) Modified on 10/2/2017 to correct text (se) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
27 | 27
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/02 9:52 AM
**FILED IN ERROR** AMENDED COMPLAINT against MedBridge Development Company, LLC amending1 Complaint, filed by KWCO, PC.(se) Modified on 10/2/2017 to edit text (se) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend Complaint
Mon 10/02 8:53 AM
Text Order GRANTING26 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Robert A. Junell. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Amend Complaint
Fri 09/29 9:11 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by KWCO, PC.(Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amend Complaint | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Parties
Thu 09/28 3:38 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL, as to VG Life Sciences, Inc. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUICE. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (se) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/27 2:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 09/22 10:06 AM
Acknowledgment Receipt for Order to Show Cause. (se) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Wed 09/20 9:22 AM
Notice of Correction: Corrections have been made to docket entry 21 & 22 regarding Motion filed in error. (se) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 09/20 9:39 AM
Text Order GRANTING21 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Medbridge Development Company, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file its Response on or before October 6, 2017. Entered by Judge Robert A. Junell. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/19 3:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
21 | 21
motion
More Definite Statement Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 09/19 3:13 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION for Extension of Time to File by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 09/18 9:26 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of19 Order to Show Cause. (se) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 09/15 3:47 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to VG Life Sciences, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (se) |
|
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/15 3:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018 05:00 PM before Judge Robert A. Junell, Jury Selection set for 11/6/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robert A. Junell, Jury Trial set for 11/6/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robert A. Junell, ADR Report Deadline due by 7/16/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 3/19/2018, Discovery due by 6/25/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2018. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (se) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 08/31 11:16 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by MedBridge Development Company, LLC. (Fasthoff, Henry) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/31 11:05 AM
MOTION to Dismiss under Rules 9(b), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by MedBridge Development Company, LLC.(Fasthoff, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of David Odell | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Fri 08/04 3:02 PM
Notice of Correction: re14 Certificate of Service. File returned summons under the event "summons returned executed" (lg1) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 08/03 3:05 PM
Acknowledgement of Certified Mail Receipt of10 Order to Show Cause (lg1) |
|
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/03 8:41 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KWCO, PC (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Show Cause
Tue 08/01 10:03 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (lg1) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Show Cause
Mon 07/31 9:02 AM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 08/01 10:04 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: MedBridge Development Company, LLC answer due 8/31/2017; VG Life Sciences, Inc. answer due 8/31/2017. (lg1) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 07/28 8:29 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of10 Order to Show Cause. (se) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/28 8:15 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to MedBridge Development Company, LLC. Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2017. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (se) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/12 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to VG Life Sciences, Inc.. (lg1) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 07/12 11:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/12/2017) (lg1) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 07/11 5:26 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by KWCO, PC as to KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sat 07/01 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KWCO, PC. MedBridge Development Company, LLC served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to VG Life Sciences, Inc. (se) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to MedBridge Development Company, LLC. (se) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 06/20 9:46 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/20/2017) (se) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 06/20 9:44 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KWCO, PC. (Brannan, Stephen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/20/2017) (se) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Tue 06/20 10:50 AM
Notice of Correction: re2 Request for Issuance of Summons,3 Request for Issuance of Summons. Pleadings were replaced due to documents being in edit format. (se) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/09 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9673143), filed by KWCO, Inc.(Brannan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/12 11:18 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert A. Junell. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw) |