Jitrade, Inc. v. Humming Fashion LK, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04311 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 1:42 AM PST |
Defendant
Design of DK, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Humming Fashion LK, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janne Walks, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chingta Chen
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
David D Kim
|
|
Defendant
Dong Hun Kim
|
|
Defendant
Hyun Suk Kim
|
|
Defendant
Inki Kim
|
|
Defendant
Yong Woo Kim
|
|
Defendant
Zio Zio USA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jitrade, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Fri 07/21 11:00 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 07/20 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/13 9:46 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (pso) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/12 6:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Chingta Chen, Design of DK, Inc., Humming Fashion LK, Inc., Janne Walks, Inc., David D Kim, Dong Hun Kim, Hyun Suk Kim, Inki Kim, Yong Woo Kim, and Zio Zio USA, Inc. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 06/12 5:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 06/12 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (jtil) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 06/09 3:16 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Jitrade, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 06/09 3:14 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 06/09 3:04 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc., (Jeong, Chan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 06/09 2:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/09 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19996713 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party Jitrade, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-C |