Ergashev et al v. Sessions et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03515 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 4:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Director Kathy A. Baran
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chief Counsel Wen-Ting Cheng
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
District Director Phyllis Coven
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary Jeh Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acting Director Andrew McCabe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acting Dir., USCIS James McCament
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Assistant Director Michael McGarrity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Sessions
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farruh Ergashev
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mehribon Obidova
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 09/25 12:17 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 9/22/17 that the action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. ( Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 9/22/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/20 12:12 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/19/2017 ) *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/18 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kathy A. Baran, Wen-Ting Cheng, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Andrew McCabe, James McCament, Michael McGarrity, Jeff Sessions (Cortes, Edwin) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/07 11:30 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kathy A. Baran, Wen-Ting Cheng, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Andrew McCabe, James McCament, Michael McGarrity, Jeff Sessions. (Cortes, Edwin) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/07 12:09 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer As to All Defendants: Defendants must answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint no later than October 9, 2017. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/7/2017. (Kovalenko, Nina) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin R. Cortes on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, Wen-Ting Cheng, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Andrew McCabe, James McCament, Michael McGarrity, Jeff Sessions (aty to be noticed) (Cortes, Edwin) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/12 4:48 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/12 4:47 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 06/12 4:46 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/12 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT for a Writ in the Nature of Mandamus against Kathy A. Baran, Wen-Ting Cheng, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Andrew McCabe, James McCament, Michael McGarrity, Jeff Sessions filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9596113 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Mehribon Obidova, Farruh Ergashev. (Grosz, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Supplement | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/12 4:44 PM
Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |