Culiver et al. v. United States of America et al.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joanna Seybert |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03514 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 4:04 AM EST |
Consol Defendant
James Helis
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Brennan Becker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James A. Helis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Transportation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Merchant Marine Academy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Burkhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connor Culiver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Heckmuller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gavin Yingling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cory Maier
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Timothy Hughes
Terminated: 11/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
84 | 84
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Tue 09/04 11:41 AM
Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet/Complaint in Case No. 18-cv-04956. (Flanagan, Doreen) |