Choi v. Ferrellgas, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03518 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 5:48 AM EST |
Defendant
Ferrellgas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Guadagno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liza Choi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
57 | 57
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 01/10 4:46 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff Liza Choi take nothing of the Defendants Ferrellgas, Inc., and Michael Guadagno; that the Defendants' Rule 56 motion for summary judgment is granted in its entirety; that this action is dismissed; and that this case is closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 1/10/2020. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
56 | 56
30+
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 01/10 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the Defendants'45 Rule 56 motion for summary judgment in its entirety, and the action is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SEE ATTACHED DECISION for details. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/10/2020. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
55 | 55
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Wed 01/08 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Kessler, Troy) |