Edmonds v. Steele
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David D Noce |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01652 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2020 |
Petitioner
Julius L. Edmonds
|
|
Respondent
Troy Steele
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - (Case)
Mon 12/07 9:39 AM
JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED and DECREED that the petition of Julius L. Edmonds for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Because petitioner has made no substantial showing that he was deprived of a constitutional right, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability under 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/7/20. (KJS) |
|
11 | 11
12
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 12/07 9:37 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth above, the petition of Julius L. Edmonds for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. The case is dismissed with prejudice. An appropriate Judgment Order is issued herewith. Petitioner has made no substantial showing that he was deprived of a constitutional right. Therefore, a certificate of appealability under 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/7/20. (KJS) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 12/07 9:41 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11,12. Mon Dec 7 09:41:16 CST 2020 (Shirley, Kelley) |
||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
misc
NextGen Remark
Tue 05/21 12:36 AM
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Traverse
Thu 08/17 12:46 PM
TRAVERSE re1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Julius L. Edmonds. (KKS) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Order to Show Cause (42:2255 and 2254 cases only)
Thu 08/03 2:48 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Respondent Troy Steele filed by Respondent Troy Steele.(Crane, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (post-conviction legal file), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Petitioner's brief on post-conviction appeal), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (State's brief on post-conviction appeal), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D (post-conviction appellate decision) | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/20 12:12 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Jacob Crane for Respondent Troy Steele. (Crane, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Full Consent to a Magistrate
Thu 07/13 12:10 PM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Petitioner Julius L. Edmonds, Respondent Troy Steele.. (KKS) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance
Fri 07/07 8:20 AM
Letter from Clerk sent to Petitioner Julius L. Edmonds re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/13/2017. (JAB) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Management Order
Mon 06/19 3:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TRACK 4: § 2254 HABEAS CORPUS PETITION - Show Cause Response due by 8/3/2017. (SEE ORDER). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 6/19/17. (KKS) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 06/19 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2 ] is GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 6/19/17. (KKS) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 06/19 3:31 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Mon Jun 19 15:31:35 CDT 2017 (Stamm, Katie) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Mon 06/12 6:27 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/12 1:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Julius L. Edmonds. (DJO) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 06/12 1:27 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Julius L. Edmonds.(DJO) |
|
Att: 1 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Judge Assignment Label, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Mon 06/12 1:29 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 06/12 1:30 PM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (DJO) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Mon 06/12 2:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jun 12 14:01:10 CDT 2017 (admin,) |