Thompson et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John M Bodenhausen |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01654 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 3:15 AM CST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Imerys Talc America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Rocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Mareira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Riggs-Stephenson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Millicent Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khalilah Rahmaan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Quarles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Puglissi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Peregrina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Paulson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Priscilla Pantoja
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marianne Oakes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruthann O'Donnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Novak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Nash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia McKinney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn McClurg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alison Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Lally
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Zink
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne Elaine Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Wolfrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Wexler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guy Villa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Tramel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Ann Tobin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thelma Rosenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Taucher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marianne Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Skinner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Sherman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evalyn Schiffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Russo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roxanne Rue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marsha Brawand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allahme Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Dipsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori DeMaille
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne Curcio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Craig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Cormier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Carreon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Buda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desiree Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Brace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Bian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Bethell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanette Bernhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Belcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Baird
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shay Amburn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mandy Jane Griffeth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flossie Lamay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin LaFlora-Lemelle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dana Koston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Kaough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corinne Higdon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Haskett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margie Hafner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Leggett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Greco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lois Goodson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Giffen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Gibson-Herron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Falls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwight Dion Edmonds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Eddy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 10/05 1:19 PM
***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:17-cv-07924, filed 10/05/2017. (DLB) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order of MDL Transfer
Wed 10/04 3:24 PM
ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) |
|
25 | 25
order
Conditional Transfer Order (does not the close the case)
Wed 10/04 11:04 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. (MDL 2738) To: District of New Jersey. Presiding: Honorable Freda L. Wolfson.. Signed by Sara S. Vance, Chair of the Panel. (ARL) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 08/31 10:46 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink. Amendment to11 Petition ,,,,, . (Blair, William) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Leave to
Thu 08/31 10:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Petition by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink. (Blair, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Full Consent to a Magistrate
Wed 07/05 8:37 AM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink, and Defendants Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (CAR) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 06/29 10:22 AM
***REMARK: This matter is stayed. Therefore, all filings, including responses to motions, are suspended until further order of the court. (CAR) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 06/22 10:30 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink.(Blair, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit W, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit X, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Y, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Z, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit AA, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit AB, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit AC | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Wed 06/21 4:38 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Remand or In the Alternative, For Leave to Inititate Discovery on Personal Jurisdiction and for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on Personal Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink. (Blair, William) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Leave to
Wed 06/21 4:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response to The Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Out of Time by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink. (Blair, William) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Expedite
Wed 06/21 4:33 PM
MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink. (Blair, William) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 06/21 4:26 PM
MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Jamie Allen, Shay Amburn, Diane Anderson, Judith Anderson, Ellen Baird, Laura Belcher, Jeanette Bernhardt, Kimberly Bethell, Mary Bian, Anita Brace, Marsha Brawand, Desiree Brown, Kathy Buda, Sherry Carreon, Michael Cormier, Pamela Craig, Joanne Curcio, Robert Davis, Lori DeMaille, Victoria Dipsey, Allahme Dixon, Katherine Dunn, Paul Eddy, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Carl Evans, David Evans, Cynthia Falls, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Patricia Giffen, Lois Goodson, Linda Greco, Mandy Jane Griffeth, Margie Hafner, Nancy Haskett, Corinne Higdon, Sherry Hill, Karen Jacobs, Sharon Kaough, Dana Koston, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Colleen Lally, Flossie Lamay, Laura Leggett, Kimberly Mareira, Alison Martin, Kathryn McClurg, Rebecca McCormick, Patricia McKinney, Terry Nash, Bryan Novak, Ruthann O'Donnell, Marianne Oakes, Priscilla Pantoja, Karen Paulson, Felicia Peregrina, Donna Puglissi, Cindy Quarles, Khalilah Rahmaan, Millicent Reese, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Pamela Rocks, Thelma Rosenberg, Sherry Ross, Roxanne Rue, Barbara Russo, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Evalyn Schiffman, Carol Sherman, Debra Skinner, Marianne Smith, Sandra Sullivan, Ronald Taucher, Karen Thompson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Jessica Torres, Leslie Tramel, Susan Turner, Guy Villa, Susan Wexler, Wendy Wolfrey, Joanne Elaine Wood, Greg Wright, Teresa Zink. (Blair, William) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 06/15 2:35 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings (ECF No. 7) is GRANTED. The instant case is stayed pending a decision on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Accordingly, the parties are instructed that no further filings may be made in this case pending further order of the Court, except that any party may file a motion to lift the stay if a party believes that it is appropriate based on a change in circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/15/2017. (NDT) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Tue 06/13 6:26 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 06/13 11:18 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent to Removal
Tue 06/13 11:13 AM
Consent to Removal by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (MFG) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Transfer Case
Tue 06/13 11:11 AM
MOTION to Transfer Venue, Motion to Dismiss the Non-Missouri Plaintiffs' Claims Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens, and Motion to Sever by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (MFG) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 06/13 11:08 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (MFG) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Tue 06/13 10:52 AM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Mandy Jane Griffeth, Linda Greco, Thelma Rosenberg, Victoria Dipsey, Marianne Smith, Laura Belcher, Wendy Wolfrey, Carl Evans, Joanne Curcio, Sandra Sullivan, Michael Cormier, Laura Leggett, Karen Paulson, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, David Evans, Donna Puglissi, Emily Riggs-Stephenson, Lori DeMaille, Mary Bian, Lois Goodson, Nancy Haskett, Anita Brace, Guy Villa, Rebecca McCormick, Susan Turner, Roxanne Rue, Brenda Gibson-Herron, Terry Nash, Sharon Kaough, Sherry Ross, Cindy Quarles, Robin LaFlora-Lemelle, Marsha Brawand, Sherry Carreon, Joanne Elaine Wood, Marianne Oakes, Millicent Reese, Felicia Peregrina, Ronald Taucher, Barbara Russo, Kimberly Mareira, Leslie Tramel, Robert Davis, Pamela Rocks, Priscilla Pantoja, Mary Ann Scarborough-Olague, Debra Skinner, Evalyn Schiffman, Jamie Allen, Pamela Craig, Karen Thompson, Patricia Giffen, Greg Wright, Dwight Dion Edmonds, Cynthia Falls, Teresa Zink, Jessica Torres, Dana Koston, Kathy Buda, Carol Sherman, Khalilah Rahmaan, Patricia McKinney, Paul Eddy, Ruthann O'Donnell, Susan Wexler, Allahme Dixon, Colleen Lally, Alison Martin, Katherine Dunn, Desiree Brown, Ellen Baird, Shay Amburn, Corinne Higdon, Kimberly Bethell, Bryan Novak, Kathryn McClurg, Jeanette Bernhardt, Karen Jacobs, Diane Anderson, Margie Hafner, Sherry Hill, Flossie Lamay, Judith Anderson.(MFG) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Mon 06/12 4:43 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Bauer, Beth) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Mon 06/12 4:42 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Bauer, Beth) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 06/12 4:41 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re7 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Bauer, Beth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Mon 06/12 4:39 PM
MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 4:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Bauer, Beth) |
|
5 | 5
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 06/12 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Bauer, Beth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 06/12 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) |
|
3 | 3
motion
File in Excess of Page Limitation
Mon 06/12 3:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memo of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Mon 06/12 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Bauer, Beth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Mon 06/12 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, case number 1722-CC01130, with receipt number 0865-5998119, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Bauer, Beth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Original Filing Form |