Barantseff v. Berryhill
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03355 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 19, 2017 1:56 PM PDT |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George E. Barantseff
1230 La Playa Street, Apt.301
San Francisco, CA 94122 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 06/06 7:38 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Asim H. Modi (Modi, Asim) |
|
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Wed 06/06 2:55 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/6/2018.(mklS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 06/06 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2018. Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. (FTR Time: 10:49-11:01.) Attorney for Plaintiff: George Barantseff, Pro Se. Attorney for Defendant: Sara Winslow. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2018) |
|
14 | 14
audio
Auto docketing digital audio upload
Wed 06/06 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2018 10:49:03 AM ]. File Size [ 5936 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:22 ]. (courtspeak) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Tue 05/08 2:44 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/8/2018.(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
oth_sup
Memorandum in Support
Mon 11/27 5:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Opposition to10 Defendant's Opposition to re9 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by George E. Barantseff. (tnS) (Filed on 11/24/2017) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 11/13 7:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy A. Berryhill re10 Brief (Lazar, Daniel) (Filed on 11/13/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
oth_sup
Brief
Thu 11/09 4:24 PM
Brief re9 Objection Opposition to "Oppositon to Motion to Dismiss" filed byNancy A. Berryhill. (Lazar, Daniel) (Filed on 11/9/2017) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Objection
Fri 10/13 3:54 PM
OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss filed by George E. Barantseff. (tnS) (Filed on 10/12/2017) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
SSA Administrative Transcript
Mon 09/11 9:13 AM
SSA Administrative Transcript - Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Administrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form filed by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 9/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 7:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Lazar, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed in Social Security Cases
Fri 06/16 9:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case filed by George E. Barantseff. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/13/2017. (tnS) (Filed on 6/15/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/14 8:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Lazar, Daniel) (Filed on 6/14/2017) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/12 6:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (tnS) (Filed on 6/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/12 6:01 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by George E. Barantseff. (tnS) (Filed on 6/12/2017) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Mon 06/12 6:00 PM
PROCEDURAL ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS. (tnS) (Filed on 6/9/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/12 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT for Relief of Denial of Waiver of Social Security (Title II) Overpayment (Summons Issued) against Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 34611125179). Filed by George E. Barantseff. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2017. (tnS) (Filed on 6/9/2017) |