Republic Storage Systems, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11310 |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Debtor
Republic Storage Systems, LLC
905 Holliston Mills Rd
Church Hill, TN 37642-4506 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
David W. Carickhoff
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Av Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 06/14/2017 12:03 AM EDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 06/13 2:41 PM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |
||
1 | 1
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 06/13 2:17 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount Paid $335. Filed by Republic Storage Systems, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 06/13 2:18 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11310 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 8482059, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
List of Creditors
Tue 06/13 2:31 PM
List of Creditors and Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Republic Storage Systems, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 06/13 2:44 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Republic Storage Systems, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 06/13 2:47 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Republic Storage Systems, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor - Rule 2016(b)
Tue 06/13 2:48 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor - Rule 2016(b) Filed by Republic Storage Systems, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 06/13 2:49 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Republic Storage Systems, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset - Corporation
Tue 06/13 4:04 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/11/2017 at 11:00 AM at J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King St., Room 3209, Wilmington, Delaware. (COH) |