ALLEN v. SAFEWAY, INC.
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Emmet G Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01148 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
SAFEWAY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ULTRA-CARE FLOOR SYSTEMS, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
TOMEEKIA ALLEN
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
ULTRA-CARE FLOOR SYSTEMS, INC.
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
SAFEWAY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/18 4:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SAFEWAY, INC..(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
.Order
Thu 01/18 6:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER in view of18 stipulation of dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/18/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/25 4:10 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer of ULTRA-CARE FLOOR SYSTEMS, INC. due by 10/31/2017, (znmw) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Tue 10/24 10:36 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 10/20 2:22 PM
Defendant Safeway, Inc. ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by SAFEWAY, INC.. Related document:14 Amended Complaint filed by TOMEEKIA ALLEN.(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/17 9:19 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 1/19/2018. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 2/19/2018. Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2018. Discovery due by 4/19/2018. (mac) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 10/16 4:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines in Court's August 4, 2017 Scheduling Order by SAFEWAY, INC.(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Mon 10/16 6:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting15 joint motion for extension of time. It is therefore ordered that plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure is due by January 19, 2018; defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure is due by February 19, 2018; a joint status report is due to the Court by March 2, 2018; and discovery closes on April 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/16/2017. (lcegs3) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/11 2:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAFEWAY, INC., ULTRA-CARE FLOOR SYSTEMS, INC. with Jury Demand filed by TOMEEKIA ALLEN.(znmw) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 10/10 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 plaintiff's consent motion to amend/correct the complaint. It is hereby ordered that [13-2] plaintiff's amended complaint is accepted as filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2017. (lcegs3) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 10/09 10:57 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by TOMEEKIA ALLEN(Malloy, Seann) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 09/25 4:18 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ULTRA-CARE FLOOR SYSTEMS, INC.. (znmw) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Fri 09/22 1:51 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SAFEWAY, INC..(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Consent Mot for Leave to File 3rd Pty Complaint | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Third Party Complaint
Thu 09/21 2:50 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ULTRA-CARE FLOOR SYSTEMS, INC. filed by SAFEWAY, INC..(znmw) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 09/20 12:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by SAFEWAY, INC.(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 09/20 6:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Granting9 defendant's consent motion for leave to file third-party complaint against Ultra-Care Floor Systems, Inc. See FRCP 14(a) ("A defending party may, as third-party plaintiff, serve a summons and complaint on a nonparty who is or may be liable to it for all or part of the claim against it. But the third-party plaintiff must, by motion, obtain the court's leave if it files the third-party complaint more than 14 days after serving its original answer.") The Court hereby enters defendant/third-party plaintiff Safeway, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/20/2017. (lcegs3) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 08/04 9:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to the parties'8 Joint Report and [8-1] Proposed Order, finding that no initial scheduling conference is necessary, it is by the Court hereby ORDERED that: Initial disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) shall be made by no later than October 16, 2017. Any amendments to the pleadings, including the joining of parties, shall be made by no later than October 9, 2017. Fact discovery shall be completed by no later than February 19, 2018. Each party is limited to 25 interrogatories and 5 depositions. Plaintiff's expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by no later than November 20, 2017. Defendant's expert disclosures shall be made by no later than December 20, 2017. Expert discovery shall be completed by no later than February 19, 2018. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by no later than January 3, 2018 informing the Court whether they consent to the appointment of a mediator from the District Court's mediation program to assist with settlement discussions. There will be a status conference on March 5, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. A status report, including a joint recommendation for further proceedings, is due by no later than February 26, 2018. If counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Counsel with primary case responsibility shall appear at this status conference and at all other hearings scheduled by the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/4/2017. (lcegs3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/04 11:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) due by 10/16/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2017. Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2018. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) due by 11/20/2017. Defendants' Expert Disclosures due by 12/20/2017. Expert Discovery due by 2/19/2018. Status Report due by 1/3/2018. Status Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Status Report, Including A Joint Recommendation due by 2/26/2018. (mac) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Thu 08/03 4:23 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
.Order
Wed 07/19 5:53 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017 (lcegs1) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/11 4:21 PM
ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference by 8/2/2017. Meet & Confer Statement due by 8/16/2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/11/17. (mac) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents
Tue 06/20 6:56 PM
Receipt on 6 19-2017 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 17-CA-003028. (zrdj) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Thu 06/15 9:28 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal, (sb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 9:21 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sb) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 06/13 3:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by SAFEWAY, INC. filed by SAFEWAY, INC..(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/13 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFEWAY, INC.. (Cuniff, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/13 12:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court D.C., case number 2017 CA 003028 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-4988555 filed by SAFEWAY, INC..(Cuniff, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A - State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh B - State Court Documents |