Kohn v. Firstsource Advantage, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roslynn R Mauskopf |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03557 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 3:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Firstsource Advantage, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Chaya Kohn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/18 12:19 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Per the notice at6 , plaintiff agrees to voluntarily dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/18/2017. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/31 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chaya Kohn (Palace, David) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Thu 08/31 10:25 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The docket in this case indicates that defendant's time to answer expired on August 14, 2017. Defendant has not answered, and plaintiff has not taken any steps to prosecute the case. Accordingly, plaintiff shall submit a status report indicating how he intends to proceed with this action by September 8, 2017. Failure to comply may result in a recommendation of dismissal for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/31/2017. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/13 5:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chaya Kohn. Firstsource Advantage, LLC waiver sent on 6/13/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Palace, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/13 3:30 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/13 3:22 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/13 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Firstsource Advantage, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9599768 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Chaya Kohn. (Palace, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/13 3:20 PM
Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |