Wald v. The Department of Education of the City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03560 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 4:47 AM EST |
Defendant
The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Department of Education of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Wald
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/10 4:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re41 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the parties as represented below, that the above-captioned action be, and it hereby is, withdrawn, discontinued, and dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs, fees, or disbursements to any party. This stipulation may be filed by either party without notice to the other. The application is granted. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/10/2020. (Love, Alexis) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/10 3:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York (Shaffer, Jack) |
|
Sunday, June 28, 2020 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Sun 06/28 11:46 AM
ORDER: In light of the notice of settlement39 and status report40 filed by Plaintiff, the settlement conference scheduled for 7/1/2020 is adjourned sine die. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by 7/28/2020 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/28/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony) |
||
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/26 10:17 AM
STATUS REPORT advising Court of the settlement reached between the parties by Karen Wald (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 06/26 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Karen Wald (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/23 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is prepared to hold a settlement conference as originally scheduled on 7/1/2020 at 2:00 PM, but via video conference. The parties shall inform the Court by 6/26/2020 whether they are able to participate via video for the settlement conference, which the Court will facilitate. If the parties both wish to proceed, then they must each provide an email address (for both counsel and a client representative) to the Court via letter so that the Court may connect the parties to a video conference. Phone numbers should also be provided. The parties should otherwise refer to this Court's Individual Practices in preparation for the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/23/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony) |
||
Sunday, April 05, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Sun 04/05 12:28 PM
ORDER: The motion for hearing38 is resolved as follows: The in-person settlement conference set for 4/14/2020 is adjourned to 7/1/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All parties must be present. Counsel are to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chambers email no later than three days before 7/1/2020 . Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Courts website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/5/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony) |
||
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Hearing
Fri 04/03 1:18 PM
First MOTION for Hearing re Status Conference,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, to request that the in person settlement conference be converted into a tele-settlement conference by Karen Wald. (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/07 1:02 PM
Minute Entry & Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara:An in-person status conference was held on 2/7/2020. Counsel for all parties were present. An in-person settlement conference will be held on 4/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All parties must be present. Counsel are to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chambers email no later than three days before 4/14/2020. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Courts website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/7/2020. (FTR Log #4:28 - 4:34.) (Ferrara, Anthony) |
||
Sunday, January 12, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Sun 01/12 10:55 AM
ORDER: The motion to adjourn conference37 is granted. The status conference set for 1/21/2020 will now be held on 2/6/2020 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/12/2020. (Ferrara, Anthony) |
||
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 01/10 2:11 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 21, 2020 by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Shaffer, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 12/10 5:40 PM
ORDER: After careful review of the motion papers submitted by both parties in the above- captioned action (see ECF Nos. 27-34), the Court finds there are genuine issues of material fact precluding summary judgment. Accordingly, the Court hereby DENIES Defendant's motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No.28 . SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/9/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/10 6:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person status conference will be held on 1/21/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/10/2019. (Ferrara, Anthony) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Fri 02/08 10:47 AM
Letter Accompanying Courtesy Copies of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York (Shaffer, Jack) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/07 2:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Plaintiff filed by Karen Wald. (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
33 | 33
respoth
Reply in Support
Thu 02/07 2:11 PM
REPLY in Support re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Shaffer, Jack) |
|
32 | 32
respoth
Rule 56.1 Statement
Thu 02/07 2:11 PM
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Karen Wald. (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
31 | 31
28
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 02/07 2:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karen Wald. (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/07 2:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Patricia Crispino filed by Karen Wald. (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/07 1:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Attorney Kapitonova filed by Karen Wald. (Karlin, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Relevant parts of Plaintiffs deposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Relevant parts of Superintendent Mills deposition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Excerpts of press articles regarding Superintendent Mills | ||
28 | 28
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 02/07 12:52 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Shaffer, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Rule 56.1 Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Assistant Corporation Counsel Bruce Rosenbaum, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 17 Memorandum in Support | ||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Amend/Correct/Supplement
Fri 01/25 5:53 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Plaintiff's response to Defendant's summary judgment motion by Karen Wald. (Kapitonova, Natalia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh "A"-decl of Patricia Crispino, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ext "B"-revised decl of Patricia Crispino | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
Fri 01/25 6:13 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 1/25/2019. (Kuntz, William) |
||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Fri 01/18 5:01 PM
Letter (cover letter listing Plaintiff's responsive papers sent to the Defendant) by Karen Wald (Kapitonova, Natalia) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/14 3:37 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/18/2019. Replies due by 2/8/2019. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 1/14/2019. (Jackson, Andrew) |
||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 01/10 1:00 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Karen Wald. (Kapitonova, Natalia) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/03 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Kevin Shaffer on behalf of The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Shaffer, Jack) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Mon 10/22 6:53 PM
Letter by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York (Rosenbaum, Bruce) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 09/18 10:24 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's motion due 10/22/2018; Plaintiff's opposition due 1/11/2019; and Defendant's reply due 2/1/2019. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests that the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other parties along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 p.m. on February 1, 2019. Defense counsel shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Mr. Andrew Jackson. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/18/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/17 6:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Papers and Request to Modify Briefing Schedule by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Moy, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Tue 09/04 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email by Justin Warren Reiter |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
20 | 20
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 09/04 5:07 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. |
|
Att: 1 Declaration In Support, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 09/04 6:12 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Warren Reiter terminated. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/4/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 07/20 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William F. Kuntz, II: Pre Motion Conference held on 7/17/2018. Appearances: Natalia Kapitonova, Esq., appeared on behalf of Plaintiff Karen Wald. Gary Moy, Esq., appeared on behalf of Defendants The Department of Education of the City of New York and The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York. The Court granted Defendants' application to make a motion for summary judgment. The Court ordered the following briefing schedule: 1) Defendants shall serve the motion for summary judgment on or before Friday, September 21, 2018; 2) Plaintiff shall serve the memorandum in opposition on or before Friday, November 16, 2018; and 3) Defendants shall serve the reply memorandum on or before Friday, December 7, 2018. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests that the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other parties along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 p.m. on December 7, 2018. Defense counsel shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Mr. Andrew Jackson. (Court Reporter Linda Danelchyk.) (Jackson, Andrew) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/02 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference previously scheduled for July 17, 2018 at 11:30 AM is rescheduled for that same day at 12:00 Noon in Courtroom 6H North before the Honorable William F. Kuntz II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/2/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/25 1:04 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for June 27, 2018 by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Moy, Gary) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/25 1:41 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Pre Motion Hearing is rescheduled to Tuesday, July 17, 2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6H North before Judge William F. Kuntz II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/25/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Mon 06/18 11:33 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Hearing set for June 27, 2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6H North before Judge William F. Kuntz II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/18/2018. (Choudhury, Farhana) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 06/14 6:32 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss Defendant's anticipated motion for summary judgment by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 05/17 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A settlement conference was held on 5/17/2018. Counsel for all parties were present; Ms. Wald and a representative for the Department of Education were also present. A settlement was not reached. The parties are reminded that the deadline to initiate dispositive motion practice entered on 9/7/2017 remains in place. (FTR Log #10:43-10:44; 12:27-12:29.) (Zhang, Fan) Modified on 5/17/2018 (Zhang, Fan) |
||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/16 10:54 AM
ORDER: The motion to adjourn the conference17 is denied. The settlement conference will take place as scheduled on 5/17/2018. If they have not done so, parties are reminded to submit their respective settlement positions ex parte to Chambers email. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/16/2018. (Zhang, Fan) |
||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/15 4:20 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference (in lieu of possible settlement) by Karen Wald. (Kapitonova, Natalia) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 03/22 9:48 AM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time to complete discovery16 is granted. The close of discovery is extended to April 16, 2018 . The settlement conference is rescheduled for 5/17/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/22/2018. (Zhang, Fan) |
||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 03/20 5:51 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to adjourn the settlement conference by Karen Wald. (Kapitonova, Natalia) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/26 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person settlement conference will be held on 4/17/2018 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions ex parte to Chambers email no later than two days before 4/17/2018. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/26/2018. (Zhang, Fan) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 01/26 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A status conference was held on 1/26/2018. Counsel for all parties were present. The close of fact discovery is extended to March 23, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (FTR Log #11:57-12:04.) (Zhang, Fan) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/25 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Dugan on behalf of Karen Wald (aty to be noticed) (Dugan, Daniel) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 01/19 3:04 PM
Letter Joint Status Report by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 12/01 12:33 PM
ORDER: The Motion to adjourn conference12 is granted. The Status Conference scheduled for 12/4/2017 at 2:30 PM is rescheduled to 1/26/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to file a joint status report letter on or before 1/19/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/1/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 11/30 5:05 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/27 1:08 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the in person status conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on 12/4/2017 will now be held at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to follow Judge Bulsara's Individual Motion Practices and rules which are available on the Court's website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/27/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/11 6:47 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the reassignment, Pursuant to 9/7/2017 Order; Status Conference Scheduled for 12/4/2017 at 11:00 AM remains; Conference will be held in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to follow Judge Bulsara's Individual Motion Practices and rules which are available on the Court's website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/11/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Saturday, September 09, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Sat 09/09 3:49 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/08 12:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 9/7/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 5/7/2018. Fact discovery due on 2/7/2018. On or before 5/15/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 6/15/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 7/15/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 12/14/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 12/7/2017, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/7/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Fri 09/08 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/7/2017 in courtroom 13A. Natalie Kapitonova appearing for Plaintiff. Scott Silverman appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:38-12:13.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/06 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Mercedes Kapitonova on behalf of Karen Wald (aty to be noticed) (Kapitonova, Natalia) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 08/31 11:59 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/31 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Warren Reiter on behalf of The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York (aty to be noticed) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
6
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/20 5:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Silverman, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A--Accomodation Request Form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B--Application for Hardship Transfer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 07/19 3:46 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Initial Conference originally scheduled for 7/27/2017 will be held on 9/7/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. The Parties are to refer to6 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 8/31/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/19/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order
Thu 06/15 3:07 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 7/20/2017. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/27/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/24/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/15/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/14 3:56 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York. (Silverman, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/14 2:44 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 2:44 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 06/13 2:39 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal, by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York (Silverman, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/13 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The City School District of the Board of Education of the City of New York, The Department of Education of the City of New York from Kings County, case number 510414/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9599917) (Silverman, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 2:43 PM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |