Dipisa v. CAC Financial Corp
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03539 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 3:42 AM EST |
Defendant
CAC Financial Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Dipisa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Thu 11/30 9:39 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held on 11/27/2017 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Eric A. Curtis. Counsel for Defendant: Monica M. Littman, present via telephone. Case called. Application to consolidate is denied. Case is closed with leave to restore on 10 days notice in no event later than 5/29/2018. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 11/21 4:55 PM
Letter Regarding Defendant CACs Application to Consolidate Related Cases Pursuant to Local Rule 50.3.1 by CAC Financial Corp (Perr, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 10/18 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 10/18/2017 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Initial Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Eric A. Curtis. Counsel for Defendant: Monica M. Littman, present via telephone. Case called. A status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 11/27/2017 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/17 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A Curtis on behalf of Peter Dipisa (aty to be noticed) (Curtis, Eric) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Mon 10/16 12:49 PM
Letter with Monica M. Littman's telephone number for 10/18/17 telephonic Initial Conference by CAC Financial Corp (Littman, Monica) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/16 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Monica M. Littman on behalf of CAC Financial Corp (notification declined or already on case) (Littman, Monica) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/16 11:44 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Monica M. Littman for Defendant CAC Financial Corp. To the extent not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/16/2017. (Budhu, Ryan) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 10/13 1:45 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part9 (Motion to Adjourn Conference): The Initial Conference will proceed on October 18, 2017 at 11:15 AM, but is converted to a telephonic conference. By Monday, October 16, 2017, counsel are to file letters with the Court providing their direct numbers for the teleconference; they are directed to be available at their identified numbers for at least two(2) hours from the 11:15 AM conference time. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/13/2017. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 10/11 3:38 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference requesting telephone conference on 10/12/17 by CAC Financial Corp. (Perr, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 10/10 1:14 PM
ORDER granting7 (Motion to Adjourn Conference): The application is granted; the Initial Conference is adjourned to Wednesday, October 18, 2017 at 11:15 AM (Courtroom 1010 in the Central Islip Federal Courthouse). Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/10/2017. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/06 5:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9888114. by CAC Financial Corp. (Littman, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
7 | 7
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 10/06 4:37 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently scheduled for October 12, 2017, by CAC Financial Corp. (Perr, Richard) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 10/06 11:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Dipisa re Notice of Hearing, (Barshay, David) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/06 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the conference originally scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 10/12/2017 is converted into a telephone conference at 11:45 am. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the conference call to 631-712-5630. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this notice on all parties upon receipt. c/ecf (Morabito, Bryan) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/15 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Peter Dipisa (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/12 4:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by CAC Financial Corp. (Perr, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 06/14 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (D'Agostino, Peter) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/13 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to CAC Financial Corp. (Landow, Concetta) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/13/2017) (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/13 3:19 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT against CAC Financial Corp filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9598351 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Peter Dipisa. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/13 3:18 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/13 3:19 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Tue 06/13 3:33 PM
Originally when the summons was issued the wrong document was attached to the docket entry. It has been has been updated with the correct document. (Landow, Concetta) |