Pinto v. Global Credit & Collection Corp.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denis R Hurley |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03540 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 5:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Global Credit & Collection Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Pinto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/31 9:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation of dismissal, DE10 , is So Ordered and this case closed. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/31/2019. (Gapinski, Michele) |
||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/30 11:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Danielle Pinto (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/11 4:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the court's calendar tomorrow's conference is adjourned to 10/19/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/11/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Mon 09/24 9:35 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Hearing Initial Conference set for 10/12/2018 12:00 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/24/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/21 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT by Danielle Pinto (Barshay, David) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 09/14 11:42 AM
ORDER : A status conference was scheduled for today at 11:00 a.m.. Neither counsel appeared, nor communicated with the court. A stipulation of discontinuance is due by 9/28/2018. Failure to respond to this order may result in a recommendation to dismiss this case for failure to prosecute.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/14/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/13 11:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 9/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/13/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/18 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Credit & Collection Corp. (Peltan, David) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/18 10:53 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Global Credit & Collection Corp.. (Peltan, David) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/13 4:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's schedule the 12/15/2017 status conference is converted to a Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 11:45 AM. The parties will jointly call (631)712-5700. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/13/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 11/16 4:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the 12/1/17 Status Conference is adjourned to 12/15/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/16/2017. C/ECF (Johnston, Linda) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/18 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: No activity has occurred in this case since 8/10/2017. A Status Conference is set for 12/1/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/18/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/10 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David George Peltan on behalf of Global Credit & Collection Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Peltan, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 7:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Danielle Pinto (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/02 12:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Pinto. Global Credit & Collection Corp. served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/13 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Global Credit & Collection Corp. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/13 3:02 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Global Credit & Collection Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9598405 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Danielle Pinto. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/13 2:59 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/13 3:01 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |