diPierro v. State University of New York at Stony Brook et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03544 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 3:47 AM EST |
Defendant
State University of New York at Stony Brook
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stony Brook Occupational Medicine, University Faculty Practice Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Stony Brook University School of Medicine
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles diPierro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
17
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 11/29 10:09 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l), the parties, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby jointly stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice. The parties will bear their own costs and fees in connection with this Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/28/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Wed 11/29 10:06 AM
ORDER Granting23 Motion to Reopen Case for the sole purpose of so-ordering the Stipulation of Settlement and General Release Agreement. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/28/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 11/27 12:35 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case for the sole purpose of so-ordering the Stipulation of Settlement and General Release Agreement by State University of New York at Stony Brook. (Hingerton, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation of Settlement and General Release Agreement to be "so-ordered" | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/07 2:10 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:21 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case Closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/3/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/02 11:20 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal to be so-ordered by State University of New York at Stony Brook (Hingerton, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation of Dismissal to be so-ordered | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 10/31 9:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Based on the representation that this action has settled, the initial conference scheduled on 11/1/2017 is hereby CANCELED. Counsel for the plaintiff shall file the appropriate stipulation of dismissal by 12/1/2017. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/31/2017. (Posillico, Lauren) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 10/30 10:30 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Stay Deadlines by Charles diPierro. (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/13 5:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 11/1/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/13/2017. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/21 4:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with affirmative defenses by Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation. (Levine, Lauren) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/11 12:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by State University of New York at Stony Brook. (Hingerton, Patricia) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/11 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Hingerton on behalf of State University of New York at Stony Brook (aty to be noticed) (Hingerton, Patricia) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/17 1:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles diPierro. Stony Brook University School of Medicine waiver sent on 6/21/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/17 12:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles diPierro. State University of New York at Stony Brook waiver sent on 6/21/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Nicole Tomey on behalf of Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Tomey, Samantha) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Levine on behalf of Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Lauren) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/07 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles diPierro. Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation waiver sent on 6/20/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Stony Brook University School of Medicine. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Stony Brook Occupational Medicine, University Faculty Practice Corporation. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to State University of New York at Stony Brook. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/14 8:42 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Charles diPierro (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/14 8:40 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Charles diPierro (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/14 8:39 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Charles diPierro (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/14 8:38 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Charles diPierro (Filosa, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/13 3:38 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/13 3:36 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against State University of New York at Stony Brook, Stony Brook Family and Preventive Medicine Services, University Faculty Practice Corporation, Stony Brook Occupational Medicine, University Faculty Practice Corporation, Stony Brook University School of Medicine filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9598962 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Charles diPierro. (Filosa, Gregory) Modified on 6/13/2017 (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Tue 06/13 3:36 PM
Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/13 3:38 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |