Bebry v. 50 Forest Avenue Corp.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03550 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 3:38 AM EST |
Defendant
50 Forest Avenue Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
J. Scott Bebry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 10/11 2:44 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re7 Stipulation of Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/6/2017. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/05 11:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by 50 Forest Avenue Corp. (Zarkin, Sloan) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Mon 06/19 12:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service of Notice of Hearing Re Initial Conference on 10/16/2017 by J. Scott Bebry (O'Brien, Robert) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/16 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to 50 Forest Avenue Corp. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 06/16 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing on Defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/14 4:05 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by J. Scott Bebry (O'Brien, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 9:32 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/14 9:29 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 9:31 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 06/14 9:40 AM
Proposed summons is rejected; the date/case number must be left blank; Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet without filling in the date and case number. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against 50 Forest Avenue Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9599581 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by J. Scott Bebry. (O'Brien, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |