St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. Henry Gasser Construction Company
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Noelle C Collins |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01656 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 4:05 AM CST |
Defendant
Henry Gasser Construction Company
|
|
Plaintiff
John Gaal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Weis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith O. Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Stricker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Smegner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Schoolfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Sauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Neiswander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Meynell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rocky Kloth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Keifner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Joyce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Deptula
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James W. Carson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Calhoun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Byrne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald J. Brussel, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James G. Brennen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Bond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Boehms
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renee Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Behlman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 10/26 2:58 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion (Doc.12 ) is GRANTED and this matter is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/26/2017. (CLO) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/17 3:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Keifner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Bob Meynell, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Keith O. Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Mike Weis. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
A Docket Text Order
Fri 09/29 1:24 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.10 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration on or before October 27, 2017. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice. No further extensions will be granted without good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 09/29/2017. (KBL) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 09/27 11:30 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment or Dismissal ;Proposed extension date October 27, 2017 by Plaintiffs Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Keifner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Bob Meynell, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Keith O. Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Mike Weis. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 08/24 9:56 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.8 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration on or before September 27, 2017. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 08/24/2017. (KBL) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/23 12:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment or Dismissal ;Proposed extension date September 27, 2017 by Plaintiffs Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Keifner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Bob Meynell, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Keith O. Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Mike Weis. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
A Docket Text Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 07/26 2:29 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.6 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Courts consideration on or before August 27, 2017. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 07/26/2017. (KBL) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 07/24 11:10 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment or Dismissal ;Proposed extension date August 27, 2017 by Plaintiffs Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Keifner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Bob Meynell, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Keith O. Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Mike Weis. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/13 1:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Courts consideration. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order to Defendant at the following address. ( A copy of this Order mailed to Defendant at given address.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 07/13/2017. (KCB) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/16 1:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Keith O. Taylor(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Jim Sauer, Kent Keifner, Mike Smegner, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Ken Stricker, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Scott Byrne, Mike Weis, Kevin Deptula, Mark Boehms, James W. Carson, Rocky Kloth, Kevin Hamilton, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James G. Brennen, Bob Meynell, Tim Schoolfield, Dan Neiswander, John Gaal, Albert Bond, Keith Taylor, Dennis Joyce(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Renee Bell, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Dennis Joyce, Robert Behlman. Henry Gasser Construction Company served on 6/14/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Tue 06/13 6:28 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Tue 06/13 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Robert Behlman, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Renee Bell, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, James G. Brennen, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, James W. Carson, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Kevin Hamilton, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Keifner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Bob Meynell, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, Mike Smegner, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Ken Stricker, Keith O. Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith O. Taylor, Mike Weis Process Server: Frederick Investigations Inc. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Henry Gasser Construction Company with receipt number 0865-5999560, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Keith O. Taylor(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Jim Sauer, Kent Keifner, Mike Smegner, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Ken Stricker, Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Scott Byrne, Mike Weis, Kevin Deptula, Mark Boehms, James W. Carson, Rocky Kloth, Kevin Hamilton, Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James G. Brennen, Bob Meynell, Tim Schoolfield, Dan Neiswander, John Gaal, Albert Bond, Keith Taylor, Dennis Joyce(in their representative capacities as trustees of the ), Robert Calhoun, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Renee Bell, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Dennis Joyce, Robert Behlman.(Campbell, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 06/13 2:35 PM
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Greg A. Campbell. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK) |