People of the State of California, et al v. Perry, et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-03406 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 1:12 AM PST |
Defendant
United States Department Of Energy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James R. Perry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District of Columbia
Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia 441 Fourth St. NW, Ste 600-S Washington
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Air-Conditioning, Heating, & Refrigeration Institute
Terminated: 08/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | 11 states including NY and CA sue Trump administration over stalled energy-use limits (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/14/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/12 2:32 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James R. Perry, United States Department Of Energy.. (Bennett, Michelle) (Filed on 7/12/2017) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/12 8:46 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Steven Santarsiero.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/11 10:08 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11535005.) filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.(Santarsiero, Steven) (Filed on 7/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Renee Bennett (Bennett, Michelle) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/07 9:18 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 32 Robert D. Snook's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/07 9:16 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 31 Gerald T. Karr's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/07 9:06 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 30 James P. Gignac's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/07 5:24 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11526608.) filed by State of Connecticut.(Snook, Robert) (Filed on 7/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/06 9:48 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11523653.) filed by State of Illinois.(Karr, Gerald) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
30 | 30
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/06 9:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11523623.) filed by State of Illinois.(Gignac, James) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/30 1:14 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 27 Lisa Kwong's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/30 1:08 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 26 Jesse Ratcliffe's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/30 12:59 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11514552.) filed by State of New York.(Kwong, Lisa) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/29 4:50 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11512215.) filed by State of Oregon. (Ratcliffe, Jesse) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/29 4:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed byCommonwealth of Massachusetts, City of New York, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Vermont, State of New York, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, People of the State of California, State of Illinois, State of Washington, State of Maine.(Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service Michelle Bennett | ||
24 | 24
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 06/29 9:04 AM
PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 24 , CLERK'S NOTICE ISSUED IN ERROR. CONSENT OF ALL STATE PLAINTIFFS E-FILED 17 . CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017) Modified on 6/29/2017 (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/29 8:45 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 22 Katherine Tierney's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/29 5:52 AM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11508748.) filed by State of Maine.(Tierney, Katherine) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit certificate of good standing | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 06/28 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by People of the State of California re8 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,, (Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/28 3:34 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 18 Sarah A. Kogel-Smucker's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
19 | 19
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 06/28 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by People of the State of California re17 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Donna M.Ryu (Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/28 2:15 PM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11507369.) filed by City of New York.(Kogel-Smucker, Sarah) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/27 3:56 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by People of the State of California, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra.. (Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 6/27/2017) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/27 9:45 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 15 Steven M. Sullivan's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/26 1:56 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11500290.) filed by State of Maryland.(Sullivan, Steven) (Filed on 6/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/23 5:12 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 12 Laura B. Murphy's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/23 5:07 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 11 I. Andrew Goldberg's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/23 7:12 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11494661.) filed by State of Vermont.(Murphy, Laura) (Filed on 6/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/22 11:13 AM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11492251.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts.(Goldberg, I. Andrew) (Filed on 6/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/21 4:55 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 9 Laura J. Watson's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/19 3:10 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Laura Watson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11482600.) filed by State of Washington. (Watson, Laura) (Filed on 6/19/2017) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 8:34 AM
Summons Issued as to James R. Perry, as Secretary of United States Department of Energy, The United States Department of Energy. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 06/16 2:47 PM
Proposed Summons. (Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 6/16/2017) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/16 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Somerset Miles Perry (Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 6/16/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 9:53 AM
Summons Issued as to James R. Perry, as Secretary of United States Department of Energy, The United States Department of Energy. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 06/15 9:49 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2017 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 06/14 9:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 06/13 2:02 PM
Proposed Summons. (Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 6/13/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11466023.). Filed byCommonwealth of Massachusetts, City of New York, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Vermont, State of New York, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, People of the State of California, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, State of Illinois, State of Washington, State of Maine.(Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 6/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Attachments |