WEBB-EL
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01111 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 03/22 10:25 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith B Webb-El in the amount of $18.00, receipt number: 4616105076. USCA#: 17-5159 (fb) Modified on 3/22/2021 to correct receipt# (fb) |
||
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 02/08 2:11 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-El in the amount of $28.00, receipt number: 4616104904. (fb) |
||
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Fri 11/20 8:44 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith B. Webb-El in the amount of $21.40, receipt number: 4616104594. USCA, 17-05159 zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 10/15 11:48 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $19.80, receipt number: 4616104369. USCA No 17-05159 zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 08/27 10:45 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $9.12, receipt number: 4616103960. USCA Number 19-5159 zrdj) |
||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Tue 09/08 6:27 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $9.12, receipt number: 4616103960. USCA No 17-05159 zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 08/03 4:34 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $33.92, receipt number: 4616103600. USCA Number 19-5159 zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 07/22 4:35 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $33.96, receipt number: 4616103386. USCA Number 19-5229 (zrdj) |
||
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 05/21 1:02 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $37.28, receipt number: 4616103098. (zsb) |
||
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
notice
Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
Wed 05/13 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re28 USCA Mandate was entered in error as a duplicate entry to27 . (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 05/13 10:58 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MANDATE of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL ; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (zrdj) Modified on 5/13/2020 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 05/13 10:57 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL ; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (Attachment: #1 USCA Judgment)(zsb) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Tue 04/28 11:01 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $21.80, receipt number: 4616102926. (zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 03/16 3:03 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $7.57, receipt number: 4616102655. USCA, 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/04 5:19 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL ; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (zrdj) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/04 5:18 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL ; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (zrdj) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 02/13 10:32 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $8.90, receipt number: 4616102376. USCA, 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 01/23 9:15 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $12.80, receipt number: 4616102156. USCA - 17-5159 (zsb) |
||
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 01/15 2:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL; Type of Document Returned:22 order. (zsb) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Fri 12/20 2:11 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re22 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (zmd) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Fri 12/20 1:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING19 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. ORDERED that the Clerk for the District Court for the District of Columbia will immediately notify the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia regarding the disposition. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/16/2019. (zmd) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 12/19 10:23 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL in the amount of $6.65, receipt number: 4616101829. USCA - 17-5159 (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Tue 11/19 4:19 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH B. WEBB-EL in the amount of $8.65, receipt number: 4616101547. USCA - 17-5159 (zrdj) |
||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Tue 11/19 4:22 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from KEITH B. WEBB-EL in the amount of $8.05, receipt number: 4616101545. (zrdj) |
||
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 11/07 4:10 PM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL (adh, ) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 11/07 4:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL (adh, ) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 11/07 4:02 PM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL ; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (adh, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 11/14 9:25 AM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL ; USCA Case Number 19-5229 (zrdj) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 09/09 4:42 PM
USCA Case Number 19-5229 for16 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL. (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 08/27 10:16 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re16 Notice of Appeal. (zsb) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 08/14 9:45 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $11.78, receipt number: 4616100186. USCA - 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 07/15 1:15 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $4.86, receipt number: 4616099528. (USCA 17-5159 (zrdj) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 08/27 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 Leave to File Denied, by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Leave to File Denied
Thu 06/13 11:56 AM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- KEITH B. WEBB-EL; Rule 60 (b)(4) & (6) Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. Case dismissed 06/09/2017 and DC Court of Appeals affirmed decision." Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zmc) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Leave to File Denied
Wed 05/22 6:22 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL; Plaintiff Webb-El, Expedited Fed R. Civ. Pro. Rule 60 (b)(4) & (6) Motion This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File DENIED 5/16/2019, case dismissed 6/09/2017 and DC Court of Appeals affirmed decision." Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/2019. (zad) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 03/13 11:21 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $1.25, receipt number: 4616097113. USCA 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Thu 02/21 5:29 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $1.96, receipt number: 4616096825. USCA - 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Fri 01/18 9:16 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $63.48, receipt number: 4616096277. USCA 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 11/14 4:57 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $5.97, receipt number: 4616095401. USCA - 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 10/24 10:27 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $3.88, receipt number: 4616095028. USCA - 17-5159 zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 09/24 10:00 AM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $4.30, receipt number: 4616094570. USCA # 17-5159 (zrdj) |
||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
misc
Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 09/05 5:54 PM
Partial Filing Fee Received from Keith Webb-el in the amount of $.20, receipt number: 4616094112. (zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/25 10:40 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to6 Notice of Appeal, filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL. USCA Case Number 17-5159 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Wed 01/03 10:01 AM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals USCA Case Number 17-5159 (sth) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 12/28 4:05 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/21/17. (zsth) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/04 12:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL (zrdj) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 12/04 12:32 PM
ORDER of USCA ORDERED that the motion to appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the district court for resolution in the first instance and that this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court as to6 Notice of Appeal, filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL. USCA Case Number 17-5159 (zrdj) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Mon 07/24 3:03 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals to correct fee status re6 Notice of Appeal; The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in District Court; USCA Case Number 17-5159 (jd) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 07/17 3:59 PM
USCA Case Number 17-5159 for6 Notice of Appeal filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL. (zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 07/12 3:46 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re6 Notice of Appeal. (sth) |
|
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 07/12 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL. Fee Status: No fee paid.(sth) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Pro Se Case
Wed 06/14 4:06 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 05/30/2017. (js) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 06/14 2:22 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 05/30/2017. (js) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 06/14 2:16 PM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL (js) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/14 1:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL (js) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT against L. BUTLER, THOMAS R. KANE, SCOTT KUBIC, JINNIFER SAAD, A. SMITH, L. SMITH, TIMOTHLY S. STEWART, J. PATRICIA WILSON SMOOT with Jury Demand filed by KEITH BRYANT WEBB-EL.(js) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application
Wed 06/14 4:09 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/08/2017. (js) |