CGG Services (U.S.) Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11637
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11637
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11647 |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CGG Services (U.S.) Inc.
Manhattan 10300 Town Park Drive
Houston, TX 77072 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 05/07 2:47 PM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Application, Final Decree
Fri 05/04 10:01 AM
Order of Final Decree, Signed on 5/4/2018, Closing the Chapter 11 Cases of CGG Holding (U.S.) Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors and Debtors in Possession . (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Application, Final Decree
Thu 05/03 9:34 PM
Application for Final Decree Closing the Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Section 350(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 Responses due by 5/3/2018,. (Kornberg, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Under Seal Document
Fri 10/20 3:10 PM
Document Under Seal Per Court Order . Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Alan W. Kornberg on behalf of CGG Services (U.S.) Inc. (See Lead Bankruptcy Case No. 17-11637 Document No. 306 for Sealing Order). (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Under Seal Document
Fri 10/20 2:53 PM
Document Under Seal Per Court Order . Schedule G Filed by Alan W. Kornberg on behalf of CGG Services (U.S.) Inc. (See Lead Bankruptcy Case No. 17-11637 Document No. 306 for Sealing Order) (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 06/15 3:59 PM
Order, signed on 6/15/2017, Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases . The docket in the chapter 11 case of CGG Holding (U.S.) Inc., Case No. 17-11637 (MG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 06/15 11:42 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11647 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 199959. Fee amount 1717.00. (Porter) |
||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 06/15 4:16 PM
Case Joint Administration. Lead Case No. 17-11637 (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Thu 06/15 4:45 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerks LLC, added to the case. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Wed 06/14 5:58 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Brian S. Hermann on behalf of CGG Services (U.S.) Inc.. (Hermann, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 06/14 4:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Alan W. Kornberg of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton on behalf of CGG Services (U.S.) Inc.. (Kornberg, Alan) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Wed 06/14 4:47 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Su, Kevin) |