TK SERVICES, INC. v. RWD CONSULTING, LLC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Berman Jackson |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01152 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 3:23 AM EST |
Defendant
RWD CONSULTING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TK SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
14
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 06/23 5:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/23/2017.(lcabj3) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 06/23 5:48 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 56, 58, and 65, and for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's8 motion to compel arbitration and dismiss is GRANTED, and plaintiff's2 motion for a preliminary injunction and3 motion for hearing are DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/23/2017. (lcabj3) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Thu 06/22 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Proposed Order by TK SERVICES, INC. re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Martin, Jeffery) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 06/22 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff failed to file a proposed order in support of its2 motion for a preliminary injunction. See LCvR 7(c) ("Each motion and opposition shall be accompanied by a proposed order."). Plaintiff shall file a proposed order as soon as possible. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/22/2017. (lcabj3) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to motion
Wed 06/21 4:52 PM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TK SERVICES, INC.. (Martin, Jeffery) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 06/21 4:48 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by TK SERVICES, INC..(Martin, Jeffery) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Wed 06/21 2:14 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RWD CONSULTING, LLC served on 6/15/2017, answer due 7/6/2017 (Martin, Jeffery) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 06/20 11:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the8 motion to compel arbitration by Wednesday, June 21, 2017. Defendant's reply shall be filed by Friday, June 23, 2017. Defendant's reply shall address the questions of whether, if the Court finds the arbitration clause to be enforceable, dismissal is the appropriate remedy, or whether the matter should be stayed pending arbitration, and whether the motion to dismiss is brought under Rule 12(b)(1) or Rule 12(b)(6). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/20/2017.(lcabj3) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to motion
Mon 06/19 10:16 PM
RESPONSE re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RWD CONSULTING, LLC.(Mengel, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-I | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/19 10:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by RWD CONSULTING, LLC re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Mengel, Paul) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Compel Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 06/19 8:10 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by RWD CONSULTING, LLC(Mengel, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/19 5:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RWD CONSULTING, LLC. (Mengel, Paul) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Warren Mengel, III on behalf of RWD CONSULTING, LLC (Mengel, Paul) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/15 11:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TK SERVICES, INC. re Order,, . (Martin, Jeffery) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 06/15 1:14 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Counsel for Defendant must enter an appearance and file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, addressing in particular the question of irreparable harm, by 6/19/2017. Plaintiff's reply, accompanied by any additional evidence in connection with its motion, shall be filed by 6/21/2017. (jth) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 06/14 5:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Counsel for defendant must enter an appearance and file an opposition to plaintiff's2 motion for a preliminary injunction, addressing in particular the question of irreparable harm, by Monday June 19, 2017. Plaintiff's reply, accompanied by any additional evidence in connection with its motion, shall be filed by Wednesday June 21, 2017. Plaintiff is obligated to provide counsel with copies of its pleadings as soon as it becomes aware of the identity of counsel for defendant, and plaintiff must serve a copy of this order on defendant by hand today. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/14/2017. (lcabj3) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 06/14 4:12 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TK SERVICES, INC. (zrdj) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Hearing
Wed 06/14 4:12 PM
MOTION for Hearing by TK SERVICES, INC. (zrdj) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 06/14 4:11 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by TK SERVICES, INC. (zrdj) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against RWD CONSULTING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616085325) filed by TK SERVICES, INC.(zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 4:09 PM
Summons (1) Issued as to RWD CONSULTING, LLC. (zrdj) |