RAOOF et al v. TILLERSON et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01156 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:21 AM EST |
Defendant
KATHY A. BARAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN F. KELLY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAMES MCCAMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARCIA PRYCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
REX W. TILLERSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SIDRA HAYE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MUSTAFA RAOOF
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 10 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/10/2018. (lctnm2) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/10 9:12 AM
ORDER. For the reasons stated in the18 Memorandum Opinion, the Government's12 Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and this matter is DISMISSED in its entirety. This is a final, appealable order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/10/2018. (lctnm2) |
|
18 | 18
17
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 04/10 9:06 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Defendants'12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/10/2018. (lctnm2) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
12
pgs
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 12/18 6:54 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Mon 12/11 2:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall now file a Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by December 18, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/11/2017. (lctnm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/11 2:20 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss due by 12/18/2017. (hmc) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
4
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 12/08 6:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 11/29 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' consent15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall now file a Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before December 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/29/2017. (lctnm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/29 3:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss due by 12/8/2017. (hmc) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 11/15 6:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
33
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 11/06 3:49 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SIDRA HAYE, M. R., MUSTAFA RAOOF.(Schmitt, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 26 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 13 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 14 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 19 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 19 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 8 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 30 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 16 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 15 pgs Exhibit | ||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/02 10:40 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge John D. Bates is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Sunday, October 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Sun 10/15 10:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 11/17/2017. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/11 10:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss by SIDRA HAYE, M. R., MUSTAFA RAOOF (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/11 1:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of13 plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time to file, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file their response to12 defendants' motion to dismiss by not later than November 17, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/11/2017 (lcjdb2) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/04 12:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON(Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 38 pgs Memorandum in Support | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 10/04 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of11 defendants' motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their answer or other response to plaintiffs' complaint by not later than today, October 4, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/04/2017. (lcjdb2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/04 3:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/4/2017. (tb) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 10/03 7:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/22 2:13 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/3/2017. (tb) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 08/21 1:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON (Adebonojo, Kenneth) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Mon 08/21 3:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of10 the government's motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The government shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by not later than October 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/21/17. (lcjdb2) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Fri 07/14 4:03 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. REX W. TILLERSON served on 6/21/2017 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Fri 07/14 4:02 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARCIA PRYCE served on 6/21/2017 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Fri 07/14 4:01 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES MCCAMENT served on 6/19/2017 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Fri 07/14 4:00 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN F. KELLY served on 6/19/2017 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Fri 07/14 3:59 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHY A. BARAN served on 6/19/2017 (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Fri 07/14 3:58 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2017. (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Fri 07/14 3:57 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/20/2017. (Schmitt, Brian) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 06/15 10:07 AM
SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to KATHY A. BARAN, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, MARCIA PRYCE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
31
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4990557) filed by M. R., SIDRA HAYE, MUSTAFA RAOOF.(Schmitt, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 9:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (md) |