CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher R Cooper |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01162 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 03/06 11:57 AM
OPINION AND ORDER denying24 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/6/2019. (lccrc1) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 10/23 5:52 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 10/16 2:49 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(Nesin, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 10/02 8:23 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Peter Newbatt Smith, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Time Record, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
8
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 09/18 3:03 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re:22 Order granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying Plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/18/2018. (lccrc1) |
|
22 | 22
order
.Order
Tue 09/18 2:58 PM
ORDER granting12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying13 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying15 Plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/18/2018. (lccrc1) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 04/02 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth E. Nesin (Nesin, Seth) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Thu 11/02 4:19 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Thu 10/19 6:34 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION for Order for in Camera Review filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 10/13 1:16 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Memorandum, and Statement of Material Facts Not in Genuine Dispute filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (See Docket Entry16 to view document). (znmw) |
|
17 | 17
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 10/12 4:53 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 MOTION for Order for in Camera Review filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(Nesin, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 10/12 4:48 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of FEC's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(Nesin, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion For Order
Thu 09/28 11:16 PM
MOTION for Order for in Camera Review by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 09/28 11:10 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Memorandum, and Statement of Material Facts Not in Genuine Dispute filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 09/28 11:07 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 09/07 6:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , Memorandum, and Statement of Material Facts Not in Genuine Dispute by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION(Nesin, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Katie A. Higginbothom, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Seth Nesin, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/31 10:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 9/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/28/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/19/2017. Replies due by 11/2/2017. (lsj) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 08/30 5:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Meet and Confer Statement and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that: Defendants motion for summary judgment is due on or before September 7, 2017; Plaintiffs opposition and cross-motion, if any, is due on or before September 28, 2017; Defendants consolidated reply and opposition is due on or before October 19, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply is due on or before November 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/30/2017. (lccrc1) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Briefing Schedule
Fri 08/04 10:51 AM
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order, by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(Nesin, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/04 10:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/17/2017 (lsj) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 08/03 2:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/3/2017. (lccrc1) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/19 4:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(Nesin, Seth) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth E. Nesin on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Nesin, Seth) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Jacobs Summers on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Summers, Harry) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Deeley on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Deeley, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 07/12 11:43 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 6/23/2017(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Thu 06/29 4:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/26/2017.(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Mon 06/19 2:57 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017. (Smith, Peter) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 06/15 9:36 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(sth) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 9:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 06/14 3:53 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4991403) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY.(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to the Attorney General, | ||
Att: 4 Summons to the U.S. Attorney |