Weaver v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Patrick A White |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-14223 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred
Tue 08/15 10:45 AM
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/15/2017. (br) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Mon 08/14 3:20 PM
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Adopting9 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: DENIED. Closing Case. Motions terminated:9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sonny DiRand Weaver, Jr. Recommending t.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/14/2017. (lrz1) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 07/21 9:29 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sonny DiRand Weaver, Jr.; Recommending that this petition for writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed with prejudice as time-barred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2244(d)(1). It is further recommended that no certificate of appealability issue, and the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 7/20/2017. (fbn) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/28 11:41 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The petitioner has paid the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 6/28/2017. (jbr) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerks Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Wed 06/28 10:10 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 6/27/2017 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS200001719 (lrz1) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/28 9:47 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sonny DiRand Weaver, Jr. (lrz1) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion
Fri 06/16 4:34 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 7/3/2017. Motions due by 7/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 6/16/2017. (fbn) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Form | ||
4 | 4
order
Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant
Fri 06/16 4:33 PM
INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 6/16/2017. (fbn) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/14 3:59 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, non payment of $5.00 filing fee. (cga) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 3:53 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (cga) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 06/14 3:52 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID. No IFP Motion filed by Sonny DiRand Weaver, Jr.(cga) |