Jones v. Minner et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03567 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 5:44 AM EST |
Defendant
John Carney
|
|
Defendant
Delaware Governor's Office
|
|
Defendant
Jack Markell
|
|
Defendant
Ruth Ann Minner
|
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Jones
11366 Sussex Highway
Greenwood, DE 19950 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order(Other)
Thu 12/21 10:53 AM
TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. 28 U.S.C. § 87;28 U.S.C. § 1404(a); 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). Plaintiff's3 motion for a change of venue to this Court is also denied. The Court offers no opinion on the merits of the action. The decision on Plaintiff's2 application to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 is reserved for the transferee court. The provision of Local Rule 83.1 that requires a seven-day stay is hereby waived. A summons shall not issue from this Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/20/2017. (Abdallah, Fida) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Thu 12/21 10:54 AM
Case electronically transferred to the District of Delaware. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida) |
||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Thu 12/21 11:37 AM
CASE: 1:17-cv-03567 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of Delaware as case 1:17-cv-01837, filed 12/21/2017. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 11:37 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Change Venue
Wed 06/14 11:35 AM
MOTION to Change Venue by Matthew Jones. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/14 11:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Jones. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/14 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew Jones. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |